Howell v. Daewon America, Inc. (CONSENT)
Plaintiff: Devin Howell
Defendant: Daewon America, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00013
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: setting on-the-record Pretrial Conference for 3/13/2020 before Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden, in Montgomery, AL; Jury Trial set for 4/13/2020 before Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden, in Montgomery, AL; Amended Pleadings due by 5/14/2019; Discovery completed by 8/14/2019; dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 9/13/2019; Mediation Notice due by 8/19/2019, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 2/28/19. Furnished to calendar group & CB.(djy, )
February 28, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge signed by counsel for Daewon America, Inc. (djy, )
February 28, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge signed by counsel for Devin Howell. (djy, )
February 27, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Willis, Kathryn)
February 5, 2019 ***Attorney Ingu Hwang for Daewon America, Inc. added pursuant to #6 answer (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, )
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/26/2019; directing counsel for the parties to complete and send to the clerk the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the clerk on or before 2/26/2019, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 2/5/19. (djy, )
February 5, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Daewon America, Inc.. (Willis, Kathryn)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Daewon America, Inc..(Willis, Kathryn)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by (illegible) for Daewon America, Inc. served on (no date given), answer due 2/5/2019. (djy, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Daewon America, Inc. and mailed CMRRR with copy of complaint to defendant. (djy, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (plaintiff) Devin Howell. (djy, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Devin Howell. (djy, )
January 4, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Devin Howell. (No PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #1 ). (djy, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Daewon America, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602051935.), filed by Devin Howell. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet, #2 fee receipt)(djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howell v. Daewon America, Inc. (CONSENT)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devin Howell
Represented By: Kira Yalon Fonteneau
Represented By: Felicia Teanna Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daewon America, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn Morris Willis
Represented By: Ingu Hwang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?