LW Properties, LLC et al v. Cooper (CONSENT)
Plaintiff: LW Properties, LLC, Capitol Service Stations, Inc., Aaryan & Pratha, Inc., Bhumi, Inc., Jai Khodiyar, Inc. and Praythyan, Inc.
Defendant: Alabama Department of Transportation and John R. Cooper
Case Number: 2:2019cv00019
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by the Dfts, if any there be, why the #20 Renewed Motion to Remand should not be granted; Show Cause Response due by 3/12/2019; Plfs may reply on or before 3/19/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 2/19/2019. (alm, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 20 Renewed MOTION to Remand by Aaryan & Pratha, Inc., Bhumi, Inc., Capitol Service Stations, Inc., Jai Khodiyar, Inc., LW Properties, LLC, Praythyan, Inc.. (Dumas, Royal)
February 19, 2019 Filing 19 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against John R. Cooper, filed by Aaryan & Pratha, Inc., Capitol Service Stations, Inc., LW Properties, LLC, Bhumi, Inc., Jai Khodiyar, Inc., Praythyan, Inc..(Dumas, Royal)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: it is ORDERED that Plfs' #15 Motion to Withdraw Amended Complaint and Motion For Leave to File Amended Complaint is GRANTED; Plfs are ORDERED to file their second amended complaint on or before 2/22/2019; Further, it is ORDERED that Dfts' #2 Motion to Dismiss Plfs' original complaint is DENIED as MOOT; Finally, it is ORDERED that Plfs' #9 Motion to Remand and Motion to Stay Dfts' Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as MOOT; After Plfs have filed their second amended complaint, the parties have leave to refile any motions previously filed. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 2/14/2019. (alm, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Alabama Department of Transportation, John R. Cooper. (Coan, Christina)
February 7, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Aaryan & Pratha, Inc., Bhumi, Inc., Capitol Service Stations, Inc., Jai Khodiyar, Inc., LW Properties, LLC, Praythyan, Inc. re #10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Dumas, Royal)
February 7, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Withdraw #8 Amended Complaint and MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Aaryan & Pratha, Inc., Bhumi, Inc., Capitol Service Stations, Inc., Jai Khodiyar, Inc., LW Properties, LLC, Praythyan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dumas, Royal). Added MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint on 2/8/2019 (alm, ). Modified on 2/8/2019 to clarify the docket text (alm, ).
February 5, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Aaryan & Pratha, Inc., Bhumi, Inc., Capitol Service Stations, Inc., Jai Khodiyar, Inc., LW Properties, LLC, Praythyan, Inc.. (Dumas, Royal)
February 5, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge signed by counsel for Alabama Department of Transportation. (alm, )
February 5, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge signed by counsel for John R. Cooper. (alm, )
February 5, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge e-signed by counsel for Aaryan & Pratha, Inc., Bhumi, Inc., Capitol Service Stations, Inc., Jai Khodiyar, Inc., LW Properties, LLC, & Praythyan, Inc.. (alm, )
February 5, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to LW Properties, LLC, Capitol Service Stations, Inc., Aaryan & Pratha, Inc., Praythyan, Inc., Bhumi, Inc., & Jai Khodiyar, Inc.; Corporate Disclosures due by 2/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(alm, )
February 5, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand and MOTION to Stay Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Aaryan & Pratha, Inc., Bhumi, Inc., Capitol Service Stations, Inc., Jai Khodiyar, Inc., LW Properties, LLC, Praythyan, Inc.. (Dumas, Royal). Added MOTION to Stay on 2/5/2019 (alm, ). Modified on 2/5/2019 to clarify the docket text (alm, ).
February 5, 2019 Filing 8 (WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S #18 ORDER) AMENDED COMPLAINT against John R. Cooper, filed by Aaryan & Pratha, Inc., Capitol Service Stations, Inc., LW Properties, LLC, Bhumi, Inc., Jai Khodiyar, Inc., Praythyan, Inc..(Dumas, Royal) Modified on 2/14/2019 (alm, ).
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by the Plfs, if any there be, why the #2 Motion to Dismiss should not be granted; Show Cause Response due by 2/5/2019; Dfts may file a reply on or before 2/19/2019; any party wishing to consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction shall complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 2/5/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 1/15/2019. (alm, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle as Presiding Judge; Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden no longer assigned to the case. (alm, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for All Parties. (alm, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Alabama Department of Transportation. (alm, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by John R. Cooper. (alm, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss by Alabama Department of Transportation, John R. Cooper. (alm, )
January 4, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Aaryan & Pratha, Inc., Bhumi, Inc., Capitol Service Stations, Inc., Jai Khodiyar, Inc., LW Properties, LLC, Praythyan, Inc.. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 -1 for pdf) (alm, )
January 4, 2019 COMPLAINT against Alabama Department of Transportation, John R. Cooper, filed by Aaryan & Pratha, Inc., Capitol Service Stations, Inc., LW Properties, LLC, Bhumi, Inc., Jai Khodiyar, Inc., Praythyan, Inc.. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 -1 for pdf)(alm, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Alabama Department of Transportation, John R. Cooper from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, AL, case number 03-CV-2018-902191.00. ( Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602051937) (Attachments: #1 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 2 - State Court Record, #3 3 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Receipt) (alm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LW Properties, LLC et al v. Cooper (CONSENT)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LW Properties, LLC
Represented By: Lullie Morgan Eason
Represented By: Royal C Dumas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capitol Service Stations, Inc.
Represented By: Lullie Morgan Eason
Represented By: Royal C Dumas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaryan & Pratha, Inc.
Represented By: Lullie Morgan Eason
Represented By: Royal C Dumas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bhumi, Inc.
Represented By: Lullie Morgan Eason
Represented By: Royal C Dumas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jai Khodiyar, Inc.
Represented By: Lullie Morgan Eason
Represented By: Royal C Dumas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Praythyan, Inc.
Represented By: Lullie Morgan Eason
Represented By: Royal C Dumas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Transportation
Represented By: Robert Mitchell Alton, III
Represented By: William Franklin Patty
Represented By: Christina Anne Coan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R. Cooper
Represented By: Robert Mitchell Alton, III
Represented By: William Franklin Patty
Represented By: Christina Anne Coan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?