Dickson v. United States Department of Agriculture Rural Development
Plaintiff: Tisha Denise Dickson
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture Rural Development
Case Number: 2:2019cv00028
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Office: Montgomery Office
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Before the court is Plaintiff's motion to dissolve the Temporary Restraining Order entered on 1/9/2019. (Doc. #4 .) Plaintiff reports that the foreclosure sale at issue has been postponed until 2/25/2019, and that the imminent and irreparable harm has subsided. It is therefore ORDERED that the motion (Doc. #4 ) is GRANTED and that the Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. #3 ) is DISSOLVED. However, Plaintiff may refile this matter within thirty days of the date of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 1/22/2019. (dmn, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 Preliminary MOTION To Dissolve #3 Temporary Restraining Order by Tisha Denise Dickson. (Morgan, Fernando) Modified on 1/22/2019 to create link to Doc. #3 . (dmn, )
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER directing that the def, its agents, servants, attorneys, agents, and employees, whether properly named herein or not, are hereby RESTRAINED and ENJOINED from conducting a foreclosure sale on the real property described on Exhibit "A" attached hereto, said properly located in Montgomery County, Alabama, until further order of the court. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 1/9/19. (Attachments: #1 civil appeals checklist)(djy, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Tisha Denise Dickson. (djy, )
January 9, 2019 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Tisha Denise Dickson. (No PDF document attached to this notice-See docket entry #1 ). (djy, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, or in the alternative FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION against United States Department of Agriculture Rural Development ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602051989.), filed by Tisha Denise Dickson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 civil cover sheet, #3 fee receipt)(djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dickson v. United States Department of Agriculture Rural Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tisha Denise Dickson
Represented By: Fernando Antonio Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture Rural Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?