Moody v. Alabama Department of Corrections et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: Thomas F. Moody
Defendant: Joseph Headley, Alabama Department of Corrections and Elmore Correctional Facility
Case Number: 2:2019cv00043
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
0 Judge: Susan Russ Walker
1 Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Joseph Headley. (Goldthwaite, Mary)
March 14, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Special Report & Answer by Joseph Headley. (Goldthwaite, Mary)
February 5, 2019 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and order of procedure signed by Jackie Cooper for Joseph Headley served on 2/4/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. (djy, )
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT on or before 3/15/2019, as further set out in order; copies mailed to plaintiff; mailed by CMRRR with complaint to defendant Headley; mailed with complaint to AG AL and Gen Counsel for ADOC. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 2/1/19. (djy, )
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until $350.00 fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Elmore Corr Fac. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 2/1/19. Furnished to cashier. (djy, )
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re: #2 application by Thomas F. Moody. (djy, )
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing that: (1) On or before 2/6/2019, Plf shall submit an inmate account statement, as further set out in order; (2) the clerk send a copy of this order to the inmate account clerk at Elmore Corr Fac. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 1/23/19. (djy, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Thomas F. Moody. (beh, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Alabama Department of Corrections, Elmore Correctional Facility, Joseph Headley, filed by Thomas F. Moody.(beh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moody v. Alabama Department of Corrections et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Headley
Represented By: Mary Arrington Goldthwaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elmore Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas F. Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?