Broadhead v. Wiggins et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: James M. Broadhead
Defendant: Correctional Brunson, Correctional Officer Austin, Brittany Marshall, S. Caldwell, Correctional Wiggins and Correctional Blue
Case Number: 2:2019cv00051
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
0 Judge: W Harold Albritton
1 Judge: Charles S Coody
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 JUDGMENT: In accordance with the order entered on this date adopting the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, Final Judgement is entered in favor of the Defendants and against the Plaintiff and this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a Final Judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 2/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(kh, )
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERED that: 1. The Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED. 2. The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by the Plaintiff (Doc. #2 ) is DENIED. 3. This case is dismissed without prejudice for the Plaintiffs failure to pay the full filing fee upon the initiation of this case. A separate Final Judgment will be entered. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 2/14/2019. (kh, )
February 13, 2019 No objections filed to the #3 Recommendation. (no pdf document attached to this entry)(kh, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE that: 1. The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by James Broadhead (Doc. #2 ) be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 2/5/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 1/22/2019. (kh, )
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by James M. Broadhead. (beh, )
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Correctional Officer Austin, Correctional Blue, Correctional Brunson, S. Caldwell, Brittany Marshall, Correctional Wiggins, filed by James M. Broadhead.(beh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadhead v. Wiggins et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Brunson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittany Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Blue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James M. Broadhead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?