Arrington v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Kendrick Arrington
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2019cv00124
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint and #2 Order signed by Social Security Administration for Nancy A. Berryhill served on 2/21/2019. (wcl, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint and #2 Order signed by Emily Sase for U.S. Attorney General served on 2/22/2019. (kr, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint and #2 Order signed by illegible for Office of Regional Counsel served on 2/21/2019. (kr, )
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint and #2 Order signed by illegible for US Attorney's Office served on 2/19/2019, answer due 5/20/2019 for Nancy A. Berryhill. (wcl, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney, Social Security Office of Regional Counsel, and U.S. Attorney General; mailed CMRRR with #1 complaint and #2 order. (kr, )
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO ANSWER Social Security Complaint within 90 days after the date of service of the complaint; plaintiff to file brief in support within 40 days of filing of the answer; defendant's reply brief and administrative record due within 30 days of brief filing; Copies mailed to counsel. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 2/15/2019. (kr, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602052386.), filed by Kendrick Arrington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(beh, ) (Attachment 2 replaced on 2/15/2019) (kr, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arrington v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendrick Arrington
Represented By: Sheila Kay Dansby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?