Brown v. Ford Motor Company(CONSENT)
Plaintiff: Darryl L. Brown
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00159
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY BRIEF re #12 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand filed by Darryl L. Brown. (Underwood, Earl)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to File Reply to Defendant Ford Motor Company's #12 Response to Plaintiff's #6 Motion to Remand. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 4/25/2019. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendant Ford Motor Company's #12 Response to Plaintiff's #6 Motion to Remand by Darryl L. Brown. (Underwood, Earl) Modified on 4/24/2019 to clean up text and create links. (dmn, )
April 22, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Ford Motor Company. (Parker, Rudolph)
April 8, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Ford Motor Company. (dmn, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Darryl L. Brown. (dmn, )
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: it is ORDERED that dft shall file a response to the #6 Motion to Remand on or before 4/22/2019; DIRECTING counsel to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 4/15/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 4/3/2019. (alm, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Error re #7 Notice of Deficiency, which is hereby STRICKEN as a clerical error; The Plf has filed his Conflict Disclosure Statement at Doc. #5 . (alm, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 7 (STRICKEN PURSUANT TO THE #8 NOTICE) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Darryl L. Brown; Corporate Disclosures due by 4/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(alm, ) Modified on 4/2/2019 (alm, ).
April 2, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION to Remand to State Court and Memorandum in Support by Darryl L. Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Buyers Order, #2 Exhibit Value Report)(Underwood, Earl)
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Darryl L. Brown. (Underwood, Earl)
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for All parties, Darryl L. Brown, Ford Motor Company. (dmn, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company. (dmn, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Ford Motor Company.(dmn, )
March 4, 2019 NOTICE by Ford Motor Company of Filing #1 Notice of Removal with the Clerk of the Circuit Court of Autauga County, AL. (dmn, ) (NO PDF, see Doc. #1 , page #9 .)
March 4, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Darryl L. Brown. (dmn, ) (NO PDF, see Doc. #1 for pdf.)
March 4, 2019 COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company, filed by Darryl L. Brown. (dmn, ) (NO PDF, see Doc. #1 for pdf.)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ford Motor Company from Circuit Court of Autauga County, Alabama, case number 04-cv-2019-900020.00. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602052578) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Filing Fee Receipt, #4 State Court Complaint)(dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Ford Motor Company(CONSENT)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl L. Brown
Represented By: Earl Price Underwood, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Jeffrey Bartow Cannon, Jr.
Represented By: Rudolph Woods Parker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?