Thomas v. Dolgencorp, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ruby Edna Thomas
Defendant: Dolgencorp, LLC and Maurice Minnifield
Case Number: 2:2019cv00208
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Myron H Thompson
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re #13 Notice. (alm, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Dismissal by Ruby Edna Thomas (Hays, Patrick)
April 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Error re #10 Conflict Disclosure Statement, which is hereby STRICKEN as an erroneous duplicate docket entry; This document has already been filed at docket entry #7 . (alm, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Maurice Minnifield re #8 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Graham, Stanley) Modified on 4/16/2019 to add the link to the #8 notice (alm, ).
April 16, 2019 Filing 10 (STRICKEN PURSUANT TO THE #12 NOTICE) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Dolgencorp, LLC. (Graham, Stanley) Modified on 4/16/2019 (alm, ).
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead; dfts shall have until 5/16/2019, to file an answer or other response to the complaint. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 4/16/2019. (alm, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Maurice Minnifield; Corporate Disclosures due by 4/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(alm, )
April 15, 2019 PURSUANT TO THE #6 MOTION - ***Attorney Stanley Eugene Graham for Maurice Minnifield added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Dolgencorp, LLC (Graham, Stanley) Modified on 4/16/2019 to remove the erroneous link from the #6 motion (alm, ).
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Dolgencorp, LLC, Maurice Minnifield. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Graham, Stanley) Modified on 4/16/2019 to add as also filed on behalf of Dft Minnifield (alm, ).
March 29, 2019 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint signed by Kelly Webster for Maurice Minnifield served on 3/27/2019, answer due 4/17/2019. (alm, )
March 29, 2019 Filing 4 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint signed by Kelly Webster for Dolgencorp, LLC served on 3/26/2019, answer due 4/16/2019. (alm, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Dolgencorp, LLC & Maurice Minnifield; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (alm, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Ruby Edna Thomas. (alm, )
March 22, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ruby Edna Thomas. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (alm, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ruby Edna Thomas, Dolgencorp, LLC (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602052924), filed by Ruby Edna Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(alm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Dolgencorp, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolgencorp, LLC
Represented By: Stanley Eugene Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurice Minnifield
Represented By: Stanley Eugene Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Edna Thomas
Represented By: Patrick Lamont Hays, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?