Clark v. City of Montgomery(CONSENT)

Plaintiff: Ted Clark
Defendant: City of Montgomery
Case Number: 2:2019cv00209
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 6/29/2020 at 10:00 AM in CR 4B in Montgomery, AL before Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle. Jury Trial set for 8/10/2020 in Montgomery, AL before Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle. Motions due by 2/10/2020. Mediation Notice due by 2/1/2020. Amended Pleadings due by Plaintiff on or before 6/14/2019. Defendants shall file any motions to amend the pleadings and to add parties on or before 7/12/2019. Discovery due by 1/20/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 5/17/2019. Furnished All CRDs.(dmn, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by City of Montgomery. (dmn, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Ted Clark. (dmn, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Chambliss, Rebecca)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER directing the parties to file the Rule 26(f) report with the proposed discovery plan as further set out in the order. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/16/2019. Any party wishing to consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction shall complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 5/16/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 4/26/2019. (dmn, )
April 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Error re #8 Conflict Disclosure Statement, which is hereby STRICKEN as an erroneous duplicate docket entry. (alm, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Ted Clark. (Sawyer, Kyle)
April 24, 2019 Filing 8 (STRICKEN PURSUANT TO THE #10 NOTICE OF ERROR) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Ted Clark. (Sawyer, Kyle) (Main Document 8 replaced on 4/25/2019 to attach a properly published PDF document) (alm, ). Modified on 4/25/2019 (alm, ).
April 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Defendant City of Montgomery. (dmn, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by City of Montgomery. (Chambliss, Rebecca)
April 22, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by City of Montgomery.(Chambliss, Rebecca)
March 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Plaintiff Ted Clark. (dmn, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ted Clark. City of Montgomery served on 3/25/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (dmn, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to City of Montgomery and returned to counsel for personal service. (dmn, )
March 22, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ted Clark. (dmn, ) (NO PDF, see Doc. #1 for pdf.)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Montgomery ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602052923.), filed by Ted Clark. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. City of Montgomery(CONSENT)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ted Clark
Represented By: Kyle David Sawyer
Represented By: Julian Lenwood McPhillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Montgomery
Represented By: Rebecca L. Chambliss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?