Richey et al v. Auto-Owners Insurance Co.(CONSENT)
Plaintiff: Tommy Richey, Devin Brian Frazier and Sharon Paige Richey
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Co.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00219
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RULE 26(f) ORDER: ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable but not later than July 17, 2019, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 6/26/2019. (kh, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 17 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr; Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (kh, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #15 Order to Show Cause filed by Sharon Paige Richey, Tommy Richey. (McDermott, Mickey) Modified on 6/21/2019 to reflect actual title, remove Devin Brian Frazier as a filer, not named in pdf, and create link. Wrong event code selected when originally filed. (dmn, )
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDERED that on or before June 17, 2019, Plaintiffs shall show cause, if any exists, as to why the motion (Doc. #2 -3) should not be granted. Defendant may file a reply on or before June 24, 2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 6/7/2019. (kh, )
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The court concludes that removal was timely, and that diversity jurisdiction exists. Accordingly, for these reasons, it is ORDERED that the Motion to Remand (Doc. #1 ) is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 6/7/2019. (kh, )
May 1, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Co. (dmn, )
May 1, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Plaintiffs Devin Brian Frazier, Sharon Paige Richey, Tommy Richey. (dmn, )
April 26, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition TO DEFENDANTS #10 OBJECTION TO REMAND and Plaintiff's Renewed Request to Remand the Action to the Circuit Court of Montgomery County, Alabama by Devin Brian Frazier, Sharon Paige Richey, Tommy Richey. (McDermott, Mickey) Modified on 4/26/2019 to create link and include full title. (dmn, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' #1 Motion to Remand filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Brittain, William) Modified on 4/18/2019 to reflect actual title, wrong event code selected when originally filed, and clean up text. (dmn, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Devin Brian Frazier, Sharon Paige Richey, Tommy Richey re #8 SECOND Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (McDermott, Mickey) Modified on 4/15/2019 to add the link to the #8 Notice (alm, ).
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 SECOND Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Sharon Paige Richey, Tommy Richey, & Devin Brian Frazier; Corporate Disclosures due by 4/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(alm, )
April 4, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Auto-Owners Insurance Co. re #4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement (Brittain, William) Modified on 4/4/2019 to add the link to the #4 Notice (alm, ).
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before 4/16/2019, Dft shall file a response to the #1 motion to remand, and Plfs shall file a reply on or before 4/23/2019; DIRECTING counsel for the parties to send to the Clerk the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 4/23/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 4/2/2019. (alm, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Sharon Paige Richey, Tommy Richey, & Devin Brian Frazier; Corporate Disclosures due by 4/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(alm, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Auto-Owners Insurance Co.; Corporate Disclosures due by 4/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(alm, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for ALL PARTIES.(alm, )
April 1, 2019 MOTION (Request) to Remand the Action to the Circuit Court of Montgomery County, Alabama by Devin Brian Frazier, Sharon Paige Richey, Tommy Richey. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (alm, )
April 1, 2019 Objection to Removal by Devin Brian Frazier, Sharon Paige Richey, Tommy Richey. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (alm, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 (Objection to Removal and MOTION (Request) to Remand) RESPONSE in Opposition TO REMOVAL by Sharon Paige Richey, Tommy Richey, Devin Brian Frazier. (McDermott, Mickey) Modified on 4/2/2019 to clarify the docket text to reflect this entry as an "Objection" and not a "Response" & to add as also filed on behalf of Plf Devin Brian Frazier (alm, ).
March 27, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Auto-Owners Insurance Co.. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #2 -6 (page 72) for pdf) (alm, )
March 27, 2019 MOTION to Compel by Auto-Owners Insurance Co.. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #2 -3 for pdf) (alm, )
March 27, 2019 ANSWER to #1 -1 Complaint by Auto-Owners Insurance Co.. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #2 -2 for pdf) (alm, )
March 27, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Devin Brian Frazier, Sharon Paige Richey, Tommy Richey. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #2 -1 for pdf) (alm, )
March 27, 2019 COMPLAINT against Auto-Owners Insurance Co. filed by Tommy Richey, Sharon Paige Richey, Devin Brian Frazier. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #2 -1 for pdf)(alm, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Auto-Owners Insurance Co. from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, AL, case number 03-CV-2018-902046.00. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602052978) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Answer to Complaint, #3 Motion to Compel, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3 - State Court Record, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Receipt)(alm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richey et al v. Auto-Owners Insurance Co.(CONSENT)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Richey
Represented By: Michael Guy Holton
Represented By: William Henry Fuller, Jr.
Represented By: Mickey JG McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devin Brian Frazier
Represented By: Michael Guy Holton
Represented By: William Henry Fuller, Jr.
Represented By: Mickey JG McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Paige Richey
Represented By: Michael Guy Holton
Represented By: William Henry Fuller, Jr.
Represented By: Mickey JG McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Co.
Represented By: William Evans Brittain
Represented By: William Henry Brittain, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?