Gipson v. Hyundai Power Transformers, USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: William Gipson
Defendant: Ted Arkuszeki, Hyundai Power Transformers, USA, Inc., Clayton Payne, Tony Wojciechowski and Ted Arkuszeski
Case Number: 2:2019cv00224
Filed: March 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
2 Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker. Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden no longer assigned to the case as referral judge. (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss , #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ted Arkuszeski, Hyundai Power Transformers, USA, Inc., Clayton Payne, Tony Wojciechowski. (Cox, Meghan)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDERED that the #19 motion is GRANTED. Defendants may file a reply on or before May 22, 2019. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 5/16/2019. (kh, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time To Reply in Support of #7 & #9 Motions to Dismiss, filed by Ted Arkuszeski, Hyundai Power Transformers, USA, Inc., Clayton Payne, Tony Wojciechowski. (Cox, Meghan) Modified on 5/16/2019 to add linkage to #7 & #9 motions & correct event(am, ).
May 14, 2019 Filing 18 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins as presiding judge and Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden as referral judge. Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (am, )
May 14, 2019 Motions No Longer Referred to US Magistrate Judge Borden: #7 & #9 MOTIONS to Dismiss. (NO PDF attached to this entry). (am, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss , #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by William Gipson. (Guerrier, Charles)
May 9, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Edward Guerrier on behalf of William Gipson (Guerrier, Charles)
April 29, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Returned Unexecuted by William Gipson as to Ted Arkuszeski with the following US Postal Service notation, "returned to sender, not deliverable as addressed-unable to forward). Counsel for plf notified via this entry that service is NOT perfected as to this defendant. (djy, )
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: DIRECTING that on or before 5/9/2019, Plaintiff shall respond to the #7 & #9 motions, and Defendants may reply on or before 5/16/2019; further DIRECTING the parties to complete and to send to the Clerk of Court the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk of Court on or before 5/16/2019, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 4/25/2019. (am, )
April 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Ted Arkuszeski, Hyundai Power Transformers, USA, Inc., Clayton Payne & Tony Wojciechowski. (am, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Tony Wojciechowski. (Cox, Meghan)
April 24, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Clayton Payne. (Cox, Meghan)
April 24, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Ted Arkuszeski. (Cox, Meghan)
April 24, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Ted Arkuszeski, Clayton Payne, Tony Wojciechowski. (Cox, Meghan)
April 24, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Hyundai Power Transformers, USA, Inc.. (Cox, Meghan)
April 24, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Hyundai Power Transformers, USA, Inc.. (Cox, Meghan)
April 8, 2019 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & Complaint signed by Jessica Payne for Clayton Payne served on 4/5/2019, answer due 4/26/2019. (am, )
April 4, 2019 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by Robin Ricks for Hyundai Power Transformers, USA, Inc. served on 4/3/2019, answer due 4/24/2019; signed by Tony Wojciechowski for Tony Wojciechowski served on 4/3/2019, answer due 4/24/2019. (kh, )
April 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for William Gipson (kh, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ted Arkuszeski, Hyundai Power Transformers, USA, Inc., Clayton Payne, Tony Wojciechowski and mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 complaint. (kh, )
March 29, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by William Gipson. (kh, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ted Arkuszeski, Hyundai Power Transformers, USA, Inc., Clayton Payne, Tony Wojciechowski ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602053005.), filed by William Gipson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )
March 28, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by William Gipson. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gipson v. Hyundai Power Transformers, USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Gipson
Represented By: Alicia Kay Haynes
Represented By: Charles Edward Guerrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Arkuszeki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Power Transformers, USA, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Bosquet Shirley
Represented By: Meghan Nowicki Cox
Represented By: Ingu Hwang
Represented By: John James Coleman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton Payne
Represented By: Elizabeth Bosquet Shirley
Represented By: Meghan Nowicki Cox
Represented By: Ingu Hwang
Represented By: John James Coleman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Wojciechowski
Represented By: Elizabeth Bosquet Shirley
Represented By: Meghan Nowicki Cox
Represented By: Ingu Hwang
Represented By: John James Coleman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Arkuszeski
Represented By: Elizabeth Bosquet Shirley
Represented By: Meghan Nowicki Cox
Represented By: Ingu Hwang
Represented By: John James Coleman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?