Whitney v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Max Whitney
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00234
Filed: April 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: DIRECTING that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable but not later than 8/12/2019, as further set out in Order; any party wishing to consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction shall complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 8/12/2019, as further set out in Order. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 7/11/2019. (am, )
July 5, 2019 ***Attorney Thomas W. Griffin, III for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. added pursuant to #16 Answer. (NO PDF attached to this entry). (am, )
July 5, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Springfield, Robert)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's #14 Unopposed Fourth Motion for Extension of Time in Which to Respond to Complaint; Defendant may file an answer or responsive pleading on or before 7/5/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 6/24/2019. (am, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 14 Fourth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Unopposed) by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Springfield, Robert)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's #12 Unopposed Third Motion for Extension of Time in which to Respond to Complaint; Defendant may file an answer or responsive pleading on or before 6/21/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 6/7/2019. (am, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 12 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Unopposed) by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Springfield, Robert)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: GRANTING Defendant's Unopposed #10 Second Motion for Extension of Time in Which to Respond to Complaint; Defendant may file an answer or responsive pleading on or before 6/7/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 5/16/2019. (am, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 10 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Unopposed) by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Springfield, Robert)
April 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (defendant) Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (djy, )
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time; def may file an answer or responsive pleading on or before 5/17/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 4/26/19. (djy, )
April 26, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Springfield, Robert)
April 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Unopposed) by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Springfield, Robert)
April 9, 2019 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, Complaint, & Conflict Disclosure Statement signed by Kelly Webster for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. served on 4/5/2019, answer due 4/26/2019. (am, )
April 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Max Whitney (kh, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 complaint and #2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement.(kh, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Max Whitney. (kh, )
April 2, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Max Whitney. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602053061.), filed by Max Whitney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitney v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Thomas W. Griffin, III
Represented By: Robert Franklin Springfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Max Whitney
Represented By: Anthony Brian Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?