Blake v. City of Montgomery

Plaintiff: Kyle Blake
Defendant: City of Montgomery
Case Number: 2:2019cv00243
Filed: April 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Brasher
Referring Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
2 Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle as referral Judge; Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, )
June 26, 2019 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker as referral Judge; Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden no longer assigned to the case. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, )
June 17, 2019 Pursuant to the Court's #15 Scheduling Order - Set Hearing:Jury Selection set for 10/19/2020 at 10:00 AM in Montgomery, AL before Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher. (No pdf attached to this entry) (furn: calendar, dh) (cnw, )
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: on-the-record Pretrial Conference set for 9/3/2020 before Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2E, the FMJ US Courthouse, Montgomery, AL; jury selection and Jury Trial set for 10/19/2020 before Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher at 10:00 AM in Montgomery, AL; Amended Pleadings due by 8/12/2019; Discovery due by 1/10/2020; Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 2/14/2020; Mediation Notice due by 1/15/2020, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 6/17/2019. (furn: calendar, dh)(cnw, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (East, Christopher)
May 13, 2019 Filing 13 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher as presiding Judge; Chief Judge Emily C. Marks no longer assigned to the case. (cnw, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 12 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks as presiding Judge and Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden as referral Judge; Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden no longer assigned to the case as presiding Judge. (cnw, )
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/24/2019; counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to complete and to send to the Clerk of Court the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk of Court on or before 5/24/2019; Do NOT electronically file the consent form nor reassignment into the record. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 5/2/2019. (cnw, )
May 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Correction re #9 Case Reassigned, to attach a corrected PDFdocument to correct a typographical error. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Main PDF docket entry #9 )(cnw, )
May 1, 2019 Filing 9 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden as presiding judge; Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case. (cnw, ) (Main Document 9 replaced on 5/1/2019) (cnw, ). Modified on 5/1/2019 to attach a corrected PDF document to correct a typographical error. (cnw, ).
April 26, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by City of Montgomery. (East, Christopher)
April 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (def) City of Montgomery. (cnw, )
April 26, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by City of Montgomery.(East, Christopher)
April 9, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Kyle Blake. (Sawyer, Kyle)
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (plf) Kyle Blake. (djy, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kyle Blake. City of Montgomery served on 4/5/2019 by process server, answer due 4/26/2019. (djy, )
April 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to City of Montgomery and returned to counsel for personal service on defendants by process server. (djy, )
April 4, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Kyle Blake. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #1 ). (djy, )
April 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Montgomery ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602053101.), filed by Kyle Blake. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet, #2 fee receipt)(djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blake v. City of Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Montgomery
Represented By: Christopher Ryan East
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Blake
Represented By: Kyle David Sawyer
Represented By: Julian Lenwood McPhillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?