Barnett v. Bio-Medical Applications of Alabama, Inc.
Plaintiff: Karen Barnett
Defendant: Fresenius Kidney Care Montgomery Baptist, Fresenius USA, Inc. and Bio-Medical Applications of Alabama, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00248
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Brasher
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/3/2020, at 2:30 PM, in Courtroom 2E, before Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher; Jury Trial set for 10/19/2020, at 10:00 AM, in Montgomery, AL before Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher; Amended Pleadings due by 8/9/2019; Discovery due by 2/5/2020; Mediation Notice due by 2/10/2020; Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 3/6/2020; Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/27/2020, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 7/9/2019. (Furnished: Calendar & DH) (alm, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion re #24 MOTION for Entry of Qualified HIPAA Protective Order filed by Karen Barnett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wright, Richard)
July 5, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Entry of Qualified HIPAA Protective Order by Bio-Medical Applications of Alabama, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Mtn for Entry of HIPAA Order)(Hodge, Leigh Anne) Modified on 7/8/2019 to clarify the docket text (alm, ).
July 5, 2019 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order Governing Confidential Information by Bio-Medical Applications of Alabama, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Mtn for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order)(Hodge, Leigh Anne)
July 5, 2019 Filing 22 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hodge, Leigh Anne)
June 3, 2019 ***PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S 20 ORDER - Attorney Ellen Presley Proctor; Riley Phillips Griffin and Leigh Anne Gilbert Hodge for Fresenius Kidney Care Montgomery Baptist and Fresenius USA, Inc. terminated. (No pdf attached to this entry) (kr, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Bio-Medical Applications of Alabama, Inc. re #19 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Hodge, Leigh Anne)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion to Dismiss Fresenius USA, Inc. and Fresenius Kidney Care Montgomery Baptist Without Prejudice; and denying as moot #4 Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 6/3/2019. (No pdf attached to this entry) (kr, )
May 31, 2019 Filing 19 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Bio-Medical Applications of Alabama, Inc.; Corporate Disclosures due by 6/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(alm, )
May 31, 2019 PURSUANT TO THE #18 ANSWER - ***Attorney Ellen Presley Proctor & Riley Phillips Griffin for Bio-Medical Applications of Alabama, Inc. added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
May 31, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to #12 First Amended Complaint by Bio-Medical Applications of Alabama, Inc., Fresenius Kidney Care Montgomery Baptist, Fresenius USA, Inc..(Hodge, Leigh Anne) Modified on 5/31/2019 to add the link to doc #12 (alm, ).
May 24, 2019 Filing 17 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Fresenius USA, Inc. and Fresenius Kidney Care Montgomery Baptist Without Prejudice by Karen Barnett. (Wright, Richard)
May 23, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Error re #15 Conflict Disclosure Statement, which is hereby STRICKEN as an erroneous duplicate docket entry; This document has already been filed at docket entry #14 . (alm, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 15 (STRICKEN PURSUANT TO THE #16 NOTICE) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Karen Barnett. (Wright, Richard) Modified on 5/23/2019 (alm, ).
May 20, 2019 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Karen Barnett re #13 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (dmn, ) (no pdf, see Doc. #14 ; wrong event selected when originally filed)
May 20, 2019 Filing 14 [PLEASE DISREGARD DOCKET ENTRY. WRONG EVENT CODE SELECTED WHEN ORIGINALLY FILED.] Response to Order Conflict Disclosure Statement by Karen Barnett. (Wright, Richard) Modified on 5/21/2019 (dmn, ).
May 17, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Karen Barnett; Corporate Disclosures due by 5/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(alm, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 12 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Bio-Medical Applications of Alabama, Inc., Fresenius Kideny Care Montgomery Baptist, Fresenius USA, Inc., filed by Karen Barnett.(Wright, Richard) Modified on 5/17/2019 to add as filed against the Dfts and not against the Plf (alm, ).
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint; it is ORDERED that the First Amended Complaint be filed forthwith. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 5/17/2019. (alm, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Karen Barnett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint)(Wright, Richard)
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher as Presiding Judge; Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson no longer assigned to the case. (alm, )
May 10, 2019 Filing 8 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson as Presiding Judge and Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker as Referral Judge; Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case as Presiding Judge. (alm, )
May 10, 2019 Motions No Longer Referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Walker: #4 MOTION to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: it is ORDERED that plf shall file a response to dft's #4 Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment by 5/13/2019; further ORDERED that Fresenius USA, Inc. may file a reply within 14 days of the response; DIRECTING counsel to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 5/10/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 4/12/2019. (alm, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for ALL PARTIES.(alm, )
April 5, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to #1 -1 Complaint by Fresenius Kidney Care Montgomery Baptist. (alm, )
April 5, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment by Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(alm, )
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Fresenius USA, Inc.. (alm, )
April 5, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Fresenius Kidney Care Montgomery Baptist. (alm, )
April 5, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Karen Barnett. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 -1 for pdf) (alm, )
April 5, 2019 COMPLAINT against Fresenius Kidney Care Montgomery Baptist, Fresenius USA, Inc., filed by Karen Barnett. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 -1 for pdf)(alm, )
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Fresenius Kidney Care Montgomery Baptist, Fresenius USA, Inc. from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, AL, case number 03-CV-2019-900374.00. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602053127) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Receipt)(alm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnett v. Bio-Medical Applications of Alabama, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Barnett
Represented By: Richard Allen Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresenius Kidney Care Montgomery Baptist
Represented By: Ellen Sloan Presley
Represented By: Leigh Anne Gilbert Hodge
Represented By: Riley Phillips Griffin
Represented By: Ellen Presley Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresenius USA, Inc.
Represented By: Ellen Sloan Presley
Represented By: Leigh Anne Gilbert Hodge
Represented By: Riley Phillips Griffin
Represented By: Ellen Presley Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bio-Medical Applications of Alabama, Inc.
Represented By: Leigh Anne Gilbert Hodge
Represented By: Riley Phillips Griffin
Represented By: Ellen Presley Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?