Townsend et al v. CitiMortgage Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bertha Townsend and William L. Townsend
Defendant: Citifinancial Servicing LLC, CitiMortgage Inc. and CitiBank N.A.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00251
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 19 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle; Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (no pdf document attached to this entry) (kh, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 18 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker; Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (kh, )
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #16 Motion for Extension of Time for filing amended complaint, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 6/19/19. (djy, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend complaint by Bertha Townsend, William L. Townsend. (Lay, Kenneth)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER GRANTING #14 MOTION for Extension of Time for filing amended complaint. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 6/17/19. (NO PDF Document attached to this notice).(djy, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend by Bertha Townsend, William L. Townsend. (Lay, Kenneth)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 6/10/2019. (no pdf document attached to this entry)(kh, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend complaint (Unopposed) by Bertha Townsend, William L. Townsend. (Lay, Kenneth)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: The Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Doc. #9 ) is ORDERED DENIED, but the Plaintiff is given leave to refile the motion on or before June 7, 2019. If the Plaintiff chooses to refile, she must attach the proposed amended complaint to the motion and state within the body of the motion whether there is opposition to the motion. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 5/28/2019. (kh, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to William L. Townsend, Bertha Townsend; Corporate Disclosures due by 6/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(wcl, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File amended complaint by Bertha Townsend, William L. Townsend. (Lay, Kenneth)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW filed by Bertha Townsend, William L. Townsend. (Lay, Kenneth)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED that on or before May 24, 2019, the Plaintiffs shall file a response to the motion (Doc. #6 ), and the Defendants shall file a reply on or before May 31, 2019. ORDERED to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before May 31, 2019. CONSENT FORMS MAY NOW BE SUBMITTED ELECTRONICALLY. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 5/10/2019. (kh, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW by CitiBank N.A., CitiMortgage Inc., Citifinancial Servicing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Keller, Richard)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 4/12/2019. (no pdf document attached to this entry)(kh, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Complaint (Unopposed) by CitiBank N.A., CitiMortgage Inc., Citifinancial Servicing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Keller, Richard)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by CitiBank N.A., CitiMortgage Inc., Citifinancial Servicing LLC. (Keller, Richard)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for CitiBank N.A., CitiMortgage Inc., Citifinancial Servicing LLC, Bertha Townsend, William L. Townsend (kh, )
April 8, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Bertha Townsend, William L. Townsend. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
April 8, 2019 COMPLAINT against CitiBank N.A., CitiMortgage Inc., Citifinancial Servicing LLC, filed by William L. Townsend, Bertha Townsend.(no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CitiBank N.A., CitiMortgage Inc., Citifinancial Servicing LLC from Circuit Court of Elmore County, AL, case number 29-CV-2019-990087.00. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602053160) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Townsend et al v. CitiMortgage Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citifinancial Servicing LLC
Represented By: Erin C. Howell
Represented By: Rik Standford Tozzi
Represented By: Richard Carlton Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiMortgage Inc.
Represented By: Erin C. Howell
Represented By: Rik Standford Tozzi
Represented By: Richard Carlton Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiBank N.A.
Represented By: Erin C. Howell
Represented By: Rik Standford Tozzi
Represented By: Richard Carlton Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bertha Townsend
Represented By: Kenneth James Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William L. Townsend
Represented By: Kenneth James Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?