Hall et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Harry R. Hall and Cynthia Hall
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Federal National Mortgage Association, TransUnion, LLC and Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00254
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 12:2605
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 RULE 26(f) ORDER: ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable but not later than July 17, 2019, as further set out in order. Previously, the parties were notified of the assignment of this case to a Magistrate Judge and the right to consent or request reassignment. See Attached Explanation. Therefore, as indicated in the notice of assignment, the parties should now confirm their decision in writing. Accordingly, counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to complete and send to the Clerk of the Court the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before July 17, 2019. DO NOT FILE THE FORM ELECTRONICALLY. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 6/26/2019. (kh, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Correction re #42 Notice to correct main PDF Document previously attached by e-filer. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Main Document entry #42 )(am, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE by Cynthia Hall, Harry R. Hall Pro Tanto Settlement With Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC (Underwood, Earl) (Main Document 42 replaced on 6/24/2019) (am, ).
June 12, 2019 Filing 41 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint, by TransUnion, LLC.(Robinett, Matthew)
May 21, 2019 Filing 40 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Reid, Kirkland)
May 21, 2019 Filing 39 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Equifax Information Services, LLC; Corporate Disclosures due by 5/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (defendant) Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (djy, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 37 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Greco, Danielle)
May 20, 2019 Filing 36 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint, by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation.(Greco, Danielle)
May 17, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Equifax Information Services, LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, & TransUnion, LLC. (am, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Correction re #33 Corporate Disclosure Statement to correct main PDF document previously filed by e-filer. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Main Document entry #33 )(am, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 33 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Greco, Danielle) (Main Document 33 replaced on 5/17/2019 to correct PDF document previously filed by e-filer) (am, ).
May 16, 2019 Filing 32 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint, by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.(Greco, Danielle)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: GRANTING Defendant Trans Union LLC's Unopposed #29 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint; Defendant Trans Union shall file their responsive pleading on or before 6/13/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 5/16/2019. (am, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 30 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by TransUnion, LLC. (Robinett, Matthew)
May 16, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by TransUnion, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Robinett, Matthew)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: GRANTING Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC's Unopposed #27 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint; Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC shall file their responsive pleading on or before 6/13/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 5/16/2019. (am, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #14 Amended Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Reid, Kirkland)
May 7, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (am, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 25 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Young, Leilus)
May 6, 2019 Filing 24 Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Young, Leilus)
May 2, 2019 Filing 23 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & Amended Complaint signed by Raymond Peters for Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation served on 4/29/2019, answer due 5/20/2019. (am, )
April 29, 2019 Filing 22 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & amended complaint signed by Kelly Webster for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC served on 4/25/2019, answer due 5/16/2019. (djy, )
April 29, 2019 Filing 21 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & amended complaint signed by Kelly Webster for Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 4/25/2019, answer due 5/16/2019. (djy, )
April 29, 2019 Filing 20 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & amended complaint signed by Laura McHaney for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 4/25/2019, answer due 5/16/2019. (djy, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. & mailed CMRRR with copy of #14 Amended Complaint. (am, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC & mailed CMRRR with copy of #14 Amended Complaint. (am, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to TransUnion, LLC & mailed CMRRR with copy of #14 Amended Complaint. (am, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC & mailed CMRRR with copy of #14 Amended Complaint. (am, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation & mailed CMRRR with copy of #14 Amended Complaint. (am, )
April 23, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, TransUnion, LLC, filed by Harry R. Hall & Cynthia Hall. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(am, )
April 23, 2019 Filing 13 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & Complaint signed by illegible for Federal National Mortgage Association served on 4/15/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (am, )
April 17, 2019 Filing 12 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & Complaint signed by Laura McHaney for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 4/11/2019, answer due 5/2/2019. (am, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 11 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & Complaint signed by Shellie White for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC served on 4/11/2019, answer due 5/2/2019. (am, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 10 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & Complaint signed by Shellie White for Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 4/11/2019, answer due 5/2/2019. (am, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Cynthia Hall, Harry R. Hall re #8 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Underwood, Earl)
April 10, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Harry R. Hall & Cynthia Hall; Corporate Disclosures due by 4/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Format)(am, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Cynthia Hall & Harry R. Hall. (am, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc and mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (am, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC and mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (am, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Federal National Mortgage Association and mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (am, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to TransUnion, LLC and mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (am, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (am, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Federal National Mortgage Association, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, & TransUnion, LLC, filed by Harry R. Hall & Cynthia Hall. ( Filing fee $400.00 receipt number 4602053152.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(am, ) Modified on 4/10/2019 to correct file date as reflected on Complaint (am, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Leilus Jackson Young, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Danielle Kara Greco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Kirkland Edward Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Whittle Robinett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Danielle Kara Greco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry R. Hall
Represented By: Kenneth Joseph Riemer
Represented By: Earl Price Underwood, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Hall
Represented By: Kenneth Joseph Riemer
Represented By: Earl Price Underwood, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?