Thomason v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al (MAG+)
Plaintiff: Steven Clayton Thomason
Defendant: Eva Bank, One West Bank, FSB, Indy Mac Bank, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Not Yet Classified: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00256
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the undersigned that Plf's Motion in Opposition to Dismiss (Doc. #1 -7), Plf's Motion to Amend and Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. #1 -9), and Plf's #4 Motion to Remand be DENIED and that Dfts' Motions to Dismiss (Docs. #1 -10, #1 -11, #1 -12) be GRANTED and this case be dismissed; Objections to R&R due by 7/22/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 7/8/2019. (wcl, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Steven Clayton Thomason; Corporate Disclosures due by 6/28/2019; copy mailed to plf with form. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(wcl, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Robinson, James) Modified on 6/18/2019 to clarify the docket text to reflect as "Amended" (wcl, ).
May 29, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Remand Supplement to Response by the FDIC, as Receiver for IndyMac Bank, F.S.B., in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Walker, Thomas)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by One West Bank, FSB, Indy Mac Bank. (Robinson, James)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Eva Bank. (Lavette, John)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Remand Response by the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver for IndyMac Bank, F.S.B., in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Walker, Thomas)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Robinson, James)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Robinson, James)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Robinson, James)
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand Under 28 U.S.C. 1447(C) by Steven Clayton Thomason. (kh, )
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED that, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636, this case be and is hereby REFERRED to the United States Magistrate Judge for all pretrial proceedings and entry of any orders or recommendation as may be appropriate. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 4/15/2019. (kh, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (kh, ) (kh, ).
April 8, 2019 NOTICE OF FILING by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
April 8, 2019 MOTION to Dismiss by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
April 8, 2019 MOTION to Dismiss by Eva Bank. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
April 8, 2019 MOTION to Amend and MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order To Stop Illegal Foreclosure by Steven Clayton Thomason. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
April 8, 2019 MOTION in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Steven Clayton Thomason. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
April 8, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Steven Clayton Thomason. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
April 8, 2019 COMPLAINT against Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Eva Bank, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, One West Bank, FSB, Indy Mac Bank ( Filing fee $ 1 receipt number 1.), filed by Steven Clayton Thomason.(no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, Alabama, case number 03-CV-2018-000433.00. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D - Part 1, #6 Exhibit D - Part 2, #7 Plf Motion in Opposition To Dismiss, #8 Affidavit of Indigency, #9 Motion to Amend and Motion for TRO, #10 EvaBank Motion to Dismiss, #11 Ocwen Motion to Dismiss, #12 EvaBank Supplement to its Motion to Dismiss, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomason v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eva Bank
Represented By: John R. Lavette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One West Bank, FSB, Indy Mac Bank
Represented By: James Hunter Robinson
Represented By: Graham Webster Gerhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: James Hunter Robinson
Represented By: Graham Webster Gerhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: James Hunter Robinson
Represented By: Graham Webster Gerhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: James Hunter Robinson
Represented By: Graham Webster Gerhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Clayton Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Thomas Edward Walker
Represented By: Hansel Eli Lightner, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?