Dowell v. Headley et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Jacob Ward Jefferson Dowell
Defendant: Alfonzo Woodson, Joseph Headley and Jefferson S. Dunn
Case Number: 2:2019cv00257
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: W Harold Albritton
Referring Judge: Charles S Coody
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before 7/19/2019 the plaintiff shall show cause why this case should not be dismissed for his failure to comply with the orders of this court and his failure to adequately prosecute this action. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 7/10/2019. (kr, )
July 9, 2019 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; #17 Order sent to Jacob Ward Jefferson Dowell was returned with the following notation, "Return To Sender, Not Deliverable As Addressed, Unable To Forward." (No pdf attached to this entry) (kr, )
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDERED that this #16 motion be and is hereby DENIED as such payments are mandated by 28 U.S.C. 1915(b) (1)(A) and 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 6/24/2019. (kh, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Reconsider Initial Filing Fee Amount Based on Plaintiff's Circumstances and Income by Jacob Ward Jefferson Dowell. (kr, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jacob Ward Jefferson Dowell. (kr, )
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before 6/28/2019 the plaintiff shall file an amended complaint, as further set out in order; DIRECTING the Clerk to provide him with a copy of the form used by prisoners to file complaints and the plaintiff shall utilize this form in filing his amended complaint. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 6/12/2019. (Mailed with inmate 1983 form as directed)(kr, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 13 Partial Filing fee received: $ 21.20, receipt number 4602053839. (kr, )
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ON MOTION: ORDER construing the #10 motion to contain a motion for waiver of the initial partial filing fee; it is ORDERED that this motion be and is hereby DENIED at this time. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 6/5/2019. (kr, )
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ON MOTION granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time; It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff be GRANTED an extension from 6/10/2019 to and including 6/25/2019 to file the $22.85 initial partial filing fee, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 6/5/2019. (kr, )
June 3, 2019 MOTION for Waiver of the Initial Partial Filing Fee by Jacob Ward Jefferson Dowell, as construed in the Court's #12 Order. (No pdf attached to this entry - See docket entry #10 for pdf) (kr, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION (Request) to Court for Extension of Time by Jacob Ward Jefferson Dowell. (kr, ) Modified on 6/5/2019 to clarify text (kr, ).
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ON MOTION: ORDER construing the #8 response to contain a motion for extension of time to pay the initial partial filing fee; it is ORDERED that this motion be and is hereby GRANTED; It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff be GRANTED an extension from 5/28/2019 to and including 6/10/2019 to file the $22.85 initial partial filing fee, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 5/14/2019. (kr, )
May 13, 2019 MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay the Initial Partial Filing Fee by Jacob Ward Jefferson Dowell, as construed in the Court's #9 Order. (No pdf attached to this entry - See docket entry #8 for pdf) (kr, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 8 Response to Order (Letter) re #6 Order Directing Prisoner Payment, by Jacob Ward Jefferson Dowell. (kr, )
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ON MOTION denying #5 Motion. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 5/6/2019. (kr, )
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $22.85 be paid on or before 5/28/2019; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Elmore Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 5/6/2019. (Furn: Cashier) (kr, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION (Request) the Court to Order the AL DOC to Transfer to Another Prison by Jacob Ward Jefferson Dowell. (kr, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Jacob Ward Jefferson Dowell. (kr, )
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before 5/15/2019 the plaintiff shall file a prison account statement from the inmate account clerk at Elmore showing the average monthly balance in plaintiff's prison account for the 6-month period immediately preceding the filing of this complaint and the average monthly deposits to plaintiff's account during the past six months; DIRECTING the Clerk to furnish him with a copy of the form affidavit used by persons seeking to proceed in forma pauperis before this court. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 4/10/2019. (IFP Application mailed with copy of order) (kr, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Jacob Ward Jefferson Dowell. (arc, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Jefferson S. Dunn, Joseph Headley, Alfonzo Woodson, filed by Jacob Ward Jefferson Dowell. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(arc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dowell v. Headley et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Ward Jefferson Dowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfonzo Woodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Headley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson S. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?