Dorn v. Vivint, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tiffany Dorn
Defendant: Vivint, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00258
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
2 Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2020, in chambers in Montgomery, Alabama before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson; Jury Trial set for 12/7/2020, at 10:00 AM, in Montgomery, Alabama before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson; Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 5/1/2020; Mediation Notice due by 4/10/2020; Amended Pleadings due by 9/25/2019; Discovery due by 3/27/2020, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/10/2019. (Furn: Calendar, AG)(kr, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Whitten, Austin)
June 26, 2019 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle as Referral Judge; Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden no longer assigned to the case. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Vivint, Inc., filed by Tiffany Dorn.(Mann, Jonathan) Modified on 6/14/2019 to clarify the docket text (kr, ).
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Vivint, Inc. re #6 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Tompkins, Jason) Modified on 6/7/2019 to add the link to the #6 Notice (alm, ).
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 26(f) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/28/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/7/2019. (alm, )
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: It is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that the plf has until 6/14/2019, to amend the complaint to allege subject-matter jurisdiction properly. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 5/31/2019. (alm, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Vivint, Inc.; Corporate Disclosures due by 6/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(alm, )
May 24, 2019 PURSUANT TO THE #5 ANSWER - ***Attorney Joseph Dennis Leavens & Jonathan Hoffmann for Vivint, Inc. added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Vivint, Inc..(Tompkins, Jason)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Vivint, Inc. with the following notation: "Return to Sender, Vacant, Unable to Forward". (alm, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Vivint, Inc.; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (alm, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Tiffany Dorn. (alm, )
April 9, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Tiffany Dorn. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (alm, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Vivint, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602053178), filed by Tiffany Dorn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(alm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dorn v. Vivint, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivint, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Brent Tompkins
Represented By: Jonathan Hoffmann
Represented By: Joseph Dennis Leavens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Dorn
Represented By: Jonathan Stephen Mann
Represented By: Austin Brock Whitten
Represented By: Michael Cory Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?