Harris v. Kinpack Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lashundra Harris
Defendant: Leroy Williams, Kinpack Inc., Charles Jones and Charlie Jones
Case Number: 2:2019cv00262
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 GENERAL BRIEFING ORDER setting out schedule for dispositive motions as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 5/20/2019. (dmn, )
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/3/2020, in Montgomery, AL, before Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins; Jury Trial set for 11/2/2020, in Montgomery, AL, before Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins; Amended Pleadings due by 8/2/2019; Discovery due by 2/10/2020; Mediation Notice due by 2/15/2020; Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 3/9/2020, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 5/17/2019. (Furnished: Calendar & WR) (alm, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 16 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins and Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle. Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle no longer assigned to the case, as presiding judge. (djy, )
May 8, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hargrove, John)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/8/2019; DIRECTING counsel to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 5/8/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 4/18/2019. (alm, )
April 17, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Leroy Williams re #9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Bradford, Stacey) Modified on 4/17/2019 to add the link to the #9 notice (alm, ).
April 17, 2019 Filing 12 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Leroy Williams.(Bradford, Stacey)
April 16, 2019 PURSUANT TO THE #10 ANSWER - ***Attorney Kara Deal Gamble for Charlie Jones added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Charlie Jones re #8 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Dukes, Carter)
April 16, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Charlie Jones.(Dukes, Carter)
April 12, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Leroy Williams; Corporate Disclosures due by 4/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(alm, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Charlie Jones; Corporate Disclosures due by 4/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(alm, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for ALL PARTIES.(alm, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Correction re #2 Answer, to attach a corrected PDF document to include the case number (which was erroneously omitted from the pleading) and to correct the certificate of service to reflect the proper date of 4/12/2019 & not 4/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Main PDF to Document #2 )(alm, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Correction re #1 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, to attach a Notice of Filing cover page & certificate of service (for the Middle District of Alabama) to the Montgomery County District Courts Notice of Filing Notice of Removal which was originally e-filed as the main PDF document in error. (Attachments: #1 Main PDF to Document #1 )(alm, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to #5 -1 Complaint by Kinpack Inc..(Hargrove, John) (Main Document 2 replaced on 4/12/2019 to attach a corrected PDF document to include the case number - which was erroneously omitted from the pleading - and to correct the certificate of service to reflect the proper date of 4/12/2019 & not 4/10/2019.) (alm, ). Modified on 4/12/2019 to add the link to the #5 -1 Complaint (alm, ).
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by Kinpack Inc. (Hargrove, John) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/12/2019 to attach a Notice of Filing cover page & certificate of service - for the Middle District of Alabama - to the Montgomery County District Court's Notice of Filing Notice of Removal which was originally e-filed as the main PDF document in error) (alm, ). Modified on 4/12/2019 (alm, ).
April 10, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Kinpack Inc.. (alm, )
April 10, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lashundra Harris. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #5 -1 for pdf) (alm, )
April 10, 2019 COMPLAINT against Charlie Jones, Kinpack Inc., Leroy Williams, filed by Lashundra Harris. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #5 -1 for pdf)(alm, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Charlie Jones, Kinpack Inc., Leroy Williams from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, AL, case number 03-CV-2019-900417.00. ( Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602053189) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Receipt) (alm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Kinpack Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Williams
Represented By: Stacey Thurman Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinpack Inc.
Represented By: John William Hargrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Jones
Represented By: Carter Hurd Dukes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlie Jones
Represented By: Carter Hurd Dukes
Represented By: Kara Deal Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lashundra Harris
Represented By: Vicky Underwood Toles
Represented By: Norman Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?