Shamburger v. Jones et al (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: Bobby Ray Shamburger, Jr.
Defendant: Karla Jones, E. Rouse, L. McDonald and D. Lewis
Case Number: 2:2019cv00272
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Brasher
Referring Judge: Charles S Coody
2 Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ON MOTION: ORDER denying at this time #14 Motion to an Amended Complaint, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 6/13/2019. (wcl, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint by Bobby Ray Shamburger, Jr. (alm, )
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ON MOTION: ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time; Dfts are GRANTED an extension from 6/10/2019, to and including 7/12/2019, to file their answer and written report. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 6/5/2019. (alm, )
June 5, 2019 AO FORM 85 mailed to counsel for D. Lewis, L. McDonald, & E. Rouse. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by D. Lewis, L. McDonald, E. Rouse. (Bledsoe, Jason)
June 5, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Special Report & Answer by D. Lewis, L. McDonald, E. Rouse. (Bledsoe, Jason)
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher. Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (djy, )
May 8, 2019 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; Service package containing #1 Complaint & #6 Order sent to Warden Karla Jones at Ventress CF was returned with the following notation: "Return to Sender, Refused, Unable to Foward"; Service package re-mailed by CMRRR to Warden Karla Jones at St. Clair CF. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 9 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #6 Order signed by E. Howard for D. Lewis served on 5/2/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (alm, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #6 Order signed by E. Howard for L. McDonald served on 5/2/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (alm, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #6 Order signed by E. Howard for E. Rouse served on 5/2/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (alm, )
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT AND ANSWER on or before 6/10/2019; copies mailed to plf; mailed by CMRRR with #1 complaint to the dfts & by regular mail to General Counsel for the AL DOC and Attorney General for the state of AL. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 4/29/2019. (alm, )
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ON MOTION: ORDER granting #2 & #4 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plf and account clerk at Donaldson CF. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 4/29/2019. (Furnished: Cashier) (alm, )
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Bobby Ray Shamburger, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Account Statement)(alm, )
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: it is ORDERED that: 1) On or before 5/1/2019, Plf shall submit an inmate account statement, as further set out in order; 2) DIRECTING the Clerk to SEND a copy of this order to the inmate account clerk at the Donaldson CF. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 4/17/2019. (Copy mailed to Account Clerk at Donaldson CF as directed)(alm, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Bobby Ray Shamburger, Jr. (beh, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Karla Jones, D. Lewis, L. McDonald, E. Rouse, filed by Bobby Ray Shamburger, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Document)(beh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shamburger v. Jones et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karla Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Rouse
Represented By: Jason Matthew Bledsoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. McDonald
Represented By: Jason Matthew Bledsoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Lewis
Represented By: Jason Matthew Bledsoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Ray Shamburger, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?