Sealey v. Jones Walker, LLP (MAG+)
Plaintiff: Melvin Lewis Sealey
Defendant: Jones Walker, LLP
Case Number: 2:2019cv00280
Filed: April 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
2 Judge: Susan Russ Walker
3 Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Filing 14 Sealey's Petition to Deny Jones Walker's Motion to Dismiss and for Sanctions (against plaintiff) by Melvin Lewis Sealey. (cnw, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 13 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson as presiding Judge and Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle as referral Judge; Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins, Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case. (cnw, )
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the #9 motion is GRANTED; DIRECTING the Clerk to reassign this action to the Honorable Myron H. Thompson, United States District Judge, and the Honorable Stephen M. Doyle, United States Magistrate Judge. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 6/4/2019. (cnw, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jones Walker, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jones Walker Partner List)(Reid, Kirkland) Modified on 5/30/2019 to reflect as satisfying #10 deficiency notice (cnw, ).
May 29, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Jones Walker, LLP; Corporate Disclosures due by 6/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Disclosure Statement)(cnw, )
May 29, 2019 MOTION for Sanctions by Jones Walker, LLP. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #8 for pdf) (cnw, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Transfer as Related Case by Jones Walker, LLP. (Reid, Kirkland) Modified on 5/29/2019 to clarify the docket text (cnw, ).
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss and for Sanctions by Jones Walker, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Property Report Card, #2 Exhibit Notice of Lis Pendens)(Reid, Kirkland)
May 14, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Melvin Lewis Sealey re #6 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (cnw, )
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 SECOND Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Melvin Lewis Sealey; Corporate Disclosures due by 5/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Disclosure Statement) (copy mailed to plf with form)(cnw, )
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #4 Summons signed by illegible for Jones Walker, LLP served on 5/8/2019, answer due 5/29/2019. (cnw, )
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jones Walker, LLP; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 complaint. (cnw, )
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE under 28 USC 636, this case is referred to the United States Magistrate Judge Honorable Susan Russ Walker for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 4/23/2019. (cnw, )
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Melvin Lewis Sealey; Corporate Disclosures due by 5/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Disclosure Statement)(cnw, )
April 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jones Walker, LLP ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602053307.), filed by Melvin Lewis Sealey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 receipt)(cnw, ) Modified on 4/23/2019 to correct the filing date (cnw, ). Modified on 4/24/2019 to add (NO IFP nor FILING FEE received) (cnw, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sealey v. Jones Walker, LLP (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Lewis Sealey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones Walker, LLP
Represented By: Kirkland Edward Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?