Noble et al v. Mettler-Toledo, LLC

Plaintiff: LaQuetta Noble and Markee Lane
Defendant: Mettler-Toledo, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00310
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #14 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal, which comports with Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) FRCP; Plfs' action against Dft has been dismissed by operation of Rule 41(a)(1); DIRECTING the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 6/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist) (wcl, )
June 17, 2019 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Markee Lane, Mettler-Toledo, LLC, LaQuetta Noble. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #14 for pdf) (cnw, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 14 (STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice) MOTION to Dismiss by Mettler-Toledo, LLC, LaQuetta Noble, Markee Lane. (Vargo, Stuart) Modified on 6/17/2019 to add as also filed on behalf of plfs (cnw, ).
June 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by LaQuetta Noble. (Dunson, Kendall)
June 3, 2019 Filing 12 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks as presiding Judge and Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr., as referral Judge; Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr no longer assigned to the case as presiding Judge. (cnw, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (def) Mettler-Toledo, LLC. (cnw, )
May 28, 2019 ***PURSUANT TO THE #8 ANSWER - Attorney Douglas Matthew Centeno for Mettler-Toledo, LLC added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, )
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/18/2019; directing counsel for the parties to complete and send to the clerk the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the clerk on or before 6/18/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 5/28/19. (djy, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Mettler-Toledo, LLC. (Vargo, Stuart)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Mettler-Toledo, LLC.(Vargo, Stuart)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #2 Summons signed by CT Corporation for Mettler-Toledo, LLC served on 5/7/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (cnw, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Markee Lane re #4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Dunson, Kendall) (Main Document 6 replaced on 5/2/2019 to convert fillable form to protected PDF) (cnw, ).
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by LaQuetta Noble re #4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Dunson, Kendall) (Main Document 5 replaced on 5/2/2019 to convert fillable form to protected PDF) (cnw, ).
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to LaQuetta Noble and Markee Lane; Corporate Disclosures due by 5/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Disclosure Statement)(cnw, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (Plaintiffs) Markee Lane, LaQuetta Noble. (cnw, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Mettler-Toledo, LLC; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 complaint. (cnw, )
April 30, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Markee Lane, LaQuetta Noble. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf) (cnw, )
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mettler-Toledo, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602053397.), filed by LaQuetta Noble, Markee Lane. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 receipt)(cnw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noble et al v. Mettler-Toledo, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaQuetta Noble
Represented By: Kendall C. Dunson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markee Lane
Represented By: Kendall C. Dunson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mettler-Toledo, LLC
Represented By: Stuart Forbes Vargo
Represented By: Douglas Matthew Centeno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?