Cook v. Ford Motor Company

Plaintiff: William Don Cook
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00335
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
2 Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schuck, Gregory) Modified on 7/2/2019 to clarify text to reflect as also filed on behalf of William Don Cook (qc/djy, ).
June 26, 2019 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle as Referral Judge; Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden no longer assigned to the case. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Bartow Cannon, Jr on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Cannon, Jeffrey)
June 6, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company re #10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Schuck, Gregory)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time; further ORDERING that def Ford Motor Company shall file a responsive pleading to plfs' class action complaint on or before 6/30/2019, as further set our in order. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 6/6/19. (djy, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Ford Motor Company; Corporate Disclosures due by 6/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Ford Motor Company. (Schuck, Gregory) Modified on 6/6/2019 to clarify text to reflect as also filed on behanlf of William Don Cook (qc/djy, ).
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 and #7 Motions for Benjamin L. Bailey and Jonathan Boggs Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice to represent the plfs in this action; counsel shall file a notice of appearance with the court. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 5/30/19. (djy, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for Jonathan D. Boggs to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50.00 receipt number 4602053620.) by William Don Cook. (Attachments: #1 certificate of good standing, #2 fee receipt)(djy, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 Motion for Benjamin L. Bailey to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50.00 receipt number 4602053619.) by William Don Cook. (Attachments: #1 certificate of good standing, #2 fee receipt)(djy, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by William Don Cook re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Barnett, Henry)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Don Cook. Ford Motor Company served on 5/10/2019, answer due 5/31/2019. (Barnett, Henry)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to William Don Cook; Corporate Disclosures due by 5/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, )
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Company and returned to counsel for personal service on defendant. (djy, )
May 8, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by William Don Cook. (NO PDF document attached-See docket entry #1 ). (djy, )
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company, filed by William Don Cook. ( Filing fee $400.00 receipt number 4602053526.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Receipt)(am, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/13/2019 to correct Judge's initials) (am, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Gregory Lee Schuck
Represented By: Jeffrey Bartow Cannon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Don Cook
Represented By: Leslie Leeann Pescia
Represented By: Wilson Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: Henry Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Benjamin L. Bailey
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Baldwin
Represented By: Jonathan D Boggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?