Stacey v. Fountain et al (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: Marcus W. Stacey
Defendant: COI Penn, Lt. Norman, Lt. Smith, Sgt. Brasswell, COI Finch, Lt. Fountain, COI Brown and COI Rush
Case Number: 2:2019cv00370
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Myron H Thompson
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Received email from ALSD regarding receipt of e-transfer case; ALSD case assigned as 1:19-cv-00373. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, )
July 15, 2019 Case transferred to Southern District of Alabama. Electronically transferred via CM/ECF transfer to Clerk. (cnw, )
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION AND ORDER: 1) The magistrate judge's #3 recommendation is adopted; 2) This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama pursuant to 28 USC 1406(a); DIRECTING the clerk to take appropriate steps to effect the transfer; This case is closed in this court. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/15/2019. (cnw, )
July 15, 2019 No objections filed to the #3 Recommendation. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama pursuant to the provisions of 28 USC 1406(a); Objections to R&R due by 7/8/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 6/21/2019. (wcl, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Marcus W. Stacey. (bes, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Sgt. Brasswell, COI Brown, COI Finch, Lt. Fountain, Lt. Norman, COI Penn, COI Rush, Lt. Smith, filed by Marcus W. Stacey.(bes, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stacey v. Fountain et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COI Penn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Brasswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COI Finch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Fountain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COI Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COI Rush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus W. Stacey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?