Shack v. Alabama Department of Corrections et al (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: Leonard Shack
Defendant: Lt Witney, State of Alabama, Officer Fitzpatrick and Alabama Department of Corrections
Case Number: 2:2019cv00402
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Special Report & Answer by Alabama Department of Corrections, Officer Fitzpatrick, State of Alabama, Lt Witney. (Goldthwaite, Mary)
August 9, 2019 Filing 13 Special Report to Inmate 1983 Complaint by Alabama Department of Corrections, Officer Fitzpatrick, State of Alabama, Lt Witney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Whitley Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B Fitzpatrick Affidavit)(Piggott, Philip)
August 8, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Lt Witney. (Piggott, Philip)
August 8, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Officer Fitzpatrick. (Piggott, Philip)
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by State of Alabama. (Piggott, Philip)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Alabama Department of Corrections. (Piggott, Philip)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Alabama Department of Corrections, Officer Fitzpatrick, State of Alabama, Lt Witney.(Piggott, Philip)
August 8, 2019 AO FORM 85 mailed to counsel for Alabama Department of Corrections, Officer Fitzpatrick, State of Alabama, & Lt Witney. (No PDF attached to this entry) (alm, )
July 19, 2019 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Copy of #6 order and complaint sent to Officer Fitzpatrick returned in mail with the following notation "returned to sender-we have more than one, specify which one" (NO PDF Document attached to this notice). (djy, )
July 9, 2019 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; Service package containing #1 Complaint & #6 Order sent to Lt. Witney was returned with the following notation: "Return to Sender, Attempted - Not Known, Unable to Forward". (No PDF attached to this entry) (alm, )
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Inmate 1983 complaint and #6 Order signed by Olivia Hicks for Officer Fitzpatrick served on 7/3/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (dmn, )
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT AND ANSWER on or before 8/12/2019; copies mailed to plf; mailed by CMRRR with #1 complaint to dfts Fitzpatrick and Witney; mailed by regular mail to General Counsel for the AL DOC & the Attorney General for the State of AL. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 7/1/2019. (alm, )
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ON MOTION: ORDER granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plf and account clerk at Bullock CF. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 7/1/2019. (Furnished: Cashier) (alm, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement filed by Leonard Shack. (alm, )
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: it is ORDERED that: 1) On or before 6/28/2019, Plf shall submit an inmate account statement reflecting the average monthly balance in his prison account and the average monthly deposits to his account for the 6-month period immediately preceding the filing of the instant complaint, as further set out in order; and 2) The Clerk of Court SEND a copy of this order to the inmate account clerk at the Bullock Correctional Facility; Plf shall immediately inform the court and Dfts or Dfts' counsel of record of any change in his address; Failure to provide a correct address to this court within 10 days following any change of address will result in the dismissal of this action. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 6/14/2019. (wcl, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Leonard Shack. (bes, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Alabama Department of Corrections, Officer Fitzpatrick, State of Alabama, Lt Witney, filed by Leonard Shack.(bes, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shack v. Alabama Department of Corrections et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt Witney
Represented By: Philip Piggott
Represented By: Mary Arrington Goldthwaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alabama
Represented By: Philip Piggott
Represented By: Mary Arrington Goldthwaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Philip Piggott
Represented By: Mary Arrington Goldthwaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections
Represented By: Philip Piggott
Represented By: Mary Arrington Goldthwaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Shack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?