Floyd et al v. VCP Bridge Kroft, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Malaika Floyd and K. P.
Defendant: VCP Bridge Kroft, LLC, Varden Capital Properties, LLC, Hammond Residential Group, Inc. and Elite Street Capital Bridge Kroft Equity DE, LP
Case Number: 2:2019cv00434
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Emily C Marks
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 NOTICE of Correction re #32 Order, which is hereby STRICKEN as an erroneous docket entry, the document was entered in the wrong case. (NO PDF document attached to this notice).(am, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 32 (STRICKEN DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR - Entered in Wrong Case) ORDER (Main Document 32 replaced on 8/13/2019) (am, ). Modified on 8/13/2019 (am, ).
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TEXT ORDER GRANTING the Defendants' #26 Motion to Accept Late Filed Response In Opposition To Plaintiff's #19 Motion To Remand. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 8/13/2019. (NO PDF attached to this entry) (am, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Correction re #29 Reply Brief to correct main PDF document previously attached by e-filer. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Main Document entry #29 )(am, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY to Defendant's Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's #19 Motion to Remand filed by Malaika Floyd, K. P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Order on Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit Elite Street's Answer)(Charles, Ryan) (Main Document 29 replaced on 8/13/2019 to correct main PDF document previously attached by e-filer) (am, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/13/2019 to redact personal information contained in original filing pursuant to the E-Government rules: #4 Redacted Exhibit A, #5 Redacted Exhibit B) (am, ). Modified on 8/13/2019 to remove incorrect linkage and add correct linkage to #19 & clarify text as reflect in pleading(am, ).
August 12, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Correction re #26 MOTION & #27 Notice (Declaration) to correct main PDF documents previously attached by e-filer. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Main Document entry #26 , #2 Corrected Main Document entry #27 )(am, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 27 DECLARATION OF TECHNICAL DIFFICULTIES re #21 by Hammond Residential Group, Inc., VCP Bridge Kroft, LLC, Varden Capital Properties, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Christy, John) (Main Document 27 replaced on 8/12/2019 to correct PDF document previously attached by e-filer and add linkage to #21 ) (am, ).
August 9, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Accept Defendants' Late Filed #21 Response In Opposition To Plaintiff's #19 Motion To Remand by Hammond Residential Group, Inc., VCP Bridge Kroft, LLC, Varden Capital Properties, LLC. (Christy, John) (Main Document 26 replaced on 8/12/2019 to correct PDF document previously attached by e-filer and add linkage to #21 & #19 ) (am, ).
August 8, 2019 Filing 25 Conflict Disclosure Statement by Malaika Floyd, & K. P. re: #22 Notice of Deficiency (Charles, Ryan) Modified on 8/9/2019 to add linkage to #22 Notice (am, ).
August 6, 2019 Filing 24 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks as presiding judge and Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker as referral judge; Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (am, )
August 6, 2019 Motions No Longer Referred to US Magistrate Susan Russ Walker: #19 First MOTION to Remand to State Court. (NO PDF attached to this entry). (am, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Elite Street Capital Bridge Kroft Equity DE, LP. (am, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 22 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Malaika Floyd & K. P.; Corporate Disclosures due by 8/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Format)(am, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Hammond Residential Group, Inc., VCP Bridge Kroft, LLC, Varden Capital Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Christy, John)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER directing that defs shall file a response to plfs' #19 MOTION to Remand by 8/2/2019; plfs may file a reply within seven days of the date of the response; directing counsel to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the clerk on or before 8/2/2019, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 7/19/19. (djy, )
July 18, 2019 MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Remand filed by Malaika Floyd, K. P. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #19 for pdf) (cnw, )
July 18, 2019 ***Pursuant to the #19 Motion - Attorney Craig Philip Niedenthal for K. P. added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 19 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Remand and Memorandum in Support by Malaika Floyd and K.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Niedenthal, Craig) Modified on 7/19/2019 to clarify the docket text (cnw, ). Modified on 7/22/2019 to reflect as also filed by K.P. (am, ).
July 10, 2019 Conflict Disclosure Statement by Hammond Residential Group, Inc. re #15 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (NO PDF attached to this entry - See doc #18 , which was incorrectly filed as a Notice). (am, )
July 10, 2019 Conflict Disclosure Statement by VCP Bridge Kroft, LLC re #15 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (NO PDF attached to this entry - See doc #17 , which was incorrectly filed as a Notice). (am, )
July 10, 2019 Conflict Disclosure Statement by Varden Capital Properties, LLC re #15 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (NO PDF attached to this entry - See doc #16 , which was incorrectly filed as Notice). (am, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by Hammond Residential Group, Inc. [CONFLICT DISCLOSURE STATEMENT] (Christy, John) (Main Document 18 replaced on 7/11/2019 to convert fillable form to protected pdf) (am, ). (Main Document 18 replaced on 8/13/2019) (am, ).
July 10, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by VCP Bridge Kroft, LLC [CONFLICT DISCLOSURE STATEMENT] (Christy, John) (Main Document 17 replaced on 7/11/2019 to convert fillable form to protected pdf) (am, ).
July 10, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by Varden Capital Properties, LLC [CONFLICT DISCLOSURE STATEMENT] (Christy, John) (Main Document 16 replaced on 7/11/2019 to convert fillable form to protected pdf) (am, ).
July 10, 2019 Filing 15 SECOND Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to VCP Bridge Kroft, LLC, Hammond Residential Group, Inc., & Varden Capital Properties, LLC; Corporate Disclosures due by 7/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Format)(am, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Non-Compliance re #13 Certificate of Serving Discovery which is hereby STRICKEN pursuant to Local Rules re: NON-Filing of Civil Discovery. (am, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 (STRICKEN PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES RE: NON-FILING OF CIVIL DISCOVERY) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by VCP Bridge Kroft, LLC CERTIFICATE OF SERVING DISCOVERY (Christy, John) Modified on 7/9/2019 (am, ).
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of CLERICAL ERROR re #11 Costs Taxed, which is hereby STRICKEN as an erroneous docket entry. (wcl, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 (STRICKEN AS A CLERICAL ERROR - ENTERED IN WRONG CIVIL ACTION) Costs Taxed in amount of $12,062.50 against Alan C. Turnham, M.D. re 55 BILL OF COSTS. (wcl, ) Modified on 7/8/2019 (wcl, ).
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's #6 Motion for John A. Christy Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 6/28/2019. (am, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Declaration of Trace McCreary by Hammond Residential Group, Inc., VCP Bridge Kroft, LLC, Varden Capital Properties, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Trace McCreary)(am, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Malaika Floyd & K. P., Hammond Residential Group, Inc., VCP Bridge Kroft, LLC, & Varden Capital Properties, LLC. (am, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to VCP Bridge Kroft, LLC, Hammond Residential Group, Inc., & Varden Capital Properties, LLC; Corporate Disclosures due by 7/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Format)(am, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John A. Christy by Hammond Residential Group, Inc., VCP Bridge Kroft, LLC, Varden Capital Properties, LLC. (Filing fee $75.00 receipt number 4602054017.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Receipt)(am, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Hammond Residential Group, Inc., VCP Bridge Kroft, LLC, and Varden Capital Properties, LLC. (am, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by Varden Capital Properties, LLC.(am, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by Hammond Residential Group, Inc.(am, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by VCP Bridge Kroft, LLC.(am, )
June 20, 2019 NOTICE of Filing to State Court by Hammond Residential Group, Inc., VCP Bridge Kroft, LLC, Varden Capital Properties, LLC re: Filing of #1 Notice of Removal. (NO PDF attached - See doc #1 ). (am, )
June 20, 2019 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hammond Residential Group, Inc., VCP Bridge Kroft, LLC, Varden Capital Properties, LLC, filed by Malaika Floyd, K. P. (NO PDF attached - See doc #1 ).(am, )
June 20, 2019 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hammond Residential Group, Inc., VCP Bridge Kroft, LLC, Varden Capital Properties, LLC, filed by Malaika Floyd, K. P. (NO PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 )(am, )
June 20, 2019 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hammond Residential Group, Inc., VCP Bridge Kroft, LLC, Varden Capital Properties, LLC, filed by Malaika Floyd, K. P. (NO PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 ).(am, )
June 20, 2019 COMPLAINT against Hammond Residential Group, Inc., VCP Bridge Kroft, LLC, filed by Malaika Floyd, K. P. (NO PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 ).(am, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hammond Residential Group, Inc., VCP Bridge Kroft, LLC, Varden Capital Properties, LLC from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, case number 03-CV-2019-900403.00. (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number 4602053967) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Amended Complaint, #3 State Court Second Amended Complaint, #4 State Court Third Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #6 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing to State Court, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Receipt)(am, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Floyd et al v. VCP Bridge Kroft, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malaika Floyd
Represented By: Ryan T. Charles
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Charles
Represented By: Craig Philip Niedenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. P.
Represented By: Ryan T. Charles
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Charles
Represented By: Craig Philip Niedenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VCP Bridge Kroft, LLC
Represented By: Ronald Wayne Wise
Represented By: John A. Christy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Varden Capital Properties, LLC
Represented By: Ronald Wayne Wise
Represented By: John A. Christy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hammond Residential Group, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald Wayne Wise
Represented By: John A. Christy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elite Street Capital Bridge Kroft Equity DE, LP
Represented By: Angie Hubbard Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?