Sanders v. Merrill (MAG+)
Plaintiff: Jarmal Jabbar Sanders
Defendant: John Merrill
Case Number: 2:2019cv00440
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
2 Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: it is ORDERED that, on or before 8/23/2019, Plf shall amend his pending #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by completing and filing the Court's long-form application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, as further set out in order; copy of AO239 Long-Form Application mailed to plf as directed. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 8/2/2019. (wcl, )
June 26, 2019 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle as referral Judge; Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden no longer assigned to the case. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, )
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE under 28 USC 636, to Magistrate Judge Honorable Gray M. Borden for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 6/25/2019. (cnw, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jarmal Jabbar Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed)(cnw, )
June 21, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jarmal Jabbar Sanders. (No pdf attached - see doc #1 for pdf) (cnw, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jarmal Jabbar Sanders. (cnw, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Merrill, filed by Jarmal Jabbar Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 attachment (mtn to issue writ of quo warranto), #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(cnw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. Merrill (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarmal Jabbar Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Merrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?