Kumi et al v. Costco Wholesale
Plaintiff: Daniel Ahiabar and Anthony Kumi
Defendant: Costco Wholesale
Case Number: 2:2019cv00442
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Myron H Thompson
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 OPINION AND ORDER: it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that: 1) Plfs' #5 motion to remand is granted; 2) Plfs' #5 motion for sanctions, attorneys fees, and costs is denied; 3) Pursuant to 28 USC 1447(c), this cause is remanded to the Circuit Court of Montgomery County, Alabama, for want of subject-matter jurisdiction; DIRECTING the Clerk to take appropriate steps to effect the remand. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist) (Certified copies of Opinion and Order & Docket Sheet mailed to Montgomery County Circuit Court)(amf, )
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Correction re #13 Acceptance and Waiver, to attach a corrected PDF document to reflect the proper initials of the Presiding Judge in the case number as "MHT" & not "SRW". (Attachments: #1 Main PDF to Document #13 )(amf, )
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (Acceptance and Waiver) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Alabama Attorney General Office. (Garrett, Billington) Modified on 11/25/2019 to clarify the docket text(amf, ). (Main Document 13 replaced on 11/26/2019 to attach a corrected PDF document to reflect the proper initials of the Presiding Judge in the case number as "MHT" & not "SRW") (amf,). Modified on 11/26/2019 (amf, ).
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ***PURSUANT TO THE #13 ACCEPTANCE AND WAIVER - Attorney Billington Malone Garrett for Interested Party Alabama Attorney General Office added. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson as Presiding Judge and Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker as Referral Judge; Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case as Presiding Judge. (alm, )
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Costco Wholesale. (Crank, Ashley)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Motions No Longer Referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Walker: #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (No PDF attached to this entry) (alm, )
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Correction re #8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement, to attach a corrected PDF document to include the attorney's signature. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Main PDF Document to Docket Entry #8 )(wcl, )
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Anthony Kumi re #7 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Thompson, Robert) Modified on 7/23/2019 to add the link to the #7 notice (wcl, ).
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Daniel Ahiabar re #7 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Thompson, Robert) Modified on 7/23/2019 to add the link to the #7 notice (wcl, ). (Main Document 8 replaced on 7/24/2019) (wcl, ). Modified on 7/24/2019 to attach a corrected PDF document to include the attorney's signature (wcl, ).
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Anthony Kumi & Daniel Ahiabar; Corporate Disclosures due by 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(alm, )
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing the defendants file a response to the #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by 7/31/2019; counsel are directed to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the clerk on or before 7/26/2019, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 7/17/19. (djy, )
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Daniel Ahiabar, Anthony Kumi. (Thompson, Robert)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for ALL PARTIES. (alm, )
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement filed by Costco Wholesale. (alm, )
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 -1 Complaint filed by Costco Wholesale. (alm, )
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Costco Wholesale from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, AL, case number 03-CV-2019-900849.00. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602053980) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Shelley Sefton, #4 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Filing Fee Receipt) (alm, )
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order COMPLAINT against Costco Wholesale, filed by Anthony Kumi, Daniel Ahiabar. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 -1 for pdf) (alm, )
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Daniel Ahiabar & Anthony Kumi. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 -1 for pdf) (alm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kumi et al v. Costco Wholesale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale
Represented By: Michael Anthony Vercher
Represented By: Ashley L Crank
Represented By: Ashley Crank Scarpetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Ahiabar
Represented By: Tiffany Nichelle Johnson-Cole
Represented By: Robert Simms Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Kumi
Represented By: Tiffany Nichelle Johnson-Cole
Represented By: Robert Simms Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?