Vidich v. Meeks et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Vidich
Defendant: Scott Ractz, Dennis Meeks, David Anderson, Alan Syler, Todd Grimes and Blake Thurman
Case Number: 2:2019cv00446
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 GENERAL BRIEFING ORDER setting out other briefing requirements, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 8/21/2019. (wcl, )
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: On-the-record Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/3/2020, in Montgomery, AL, before Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins; Jury Trial set for 11/2/2020, in Montgomery, AL, before Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins; Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 3/9/2020; Mediation Notice due by 2/15/2020; Amended Pleadings due by 10/29/2019; Discovery due by 2/10/2020, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 8/20/2019. (furn: calendar, wr) (wcl, )
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER construing the request for entry of the Court's standard HIPAA protective order (Doc #17 , at 4) as a motion; ORDER denying with leave to refile #17 Motion for Entry of the Court's Standard Protective Order, contained within the Rule 26(f) report. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 8/19/2019. (wcl, )
August 14, 2019 MOTION for Entry of the Court's Standard HIPAA Protective Order by David Anderson, Todd Grimes, Dennis Meeks, Scott Ractz, Alan Syler, Blake Thurman, as construed in the court's #18 Order. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #17 for pdf) (wcl, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hill, Charles)
August 14, 2019 ***PURSUANT TO THE #17 RULE 26(F) REPORT - Attorney Blake Edward Brookshire for David Anderson, Todd Grimes, Dennis Meeks, Scott Ractz, Alan Syler, Blake Thurman added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Todd Grimes re #9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Hill, Charles)
July 23, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Scott Ractz re #9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Hill, Charles)
July 23, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Dennis Meeks re #9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Hill, Charles)
July 23, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by David Anderson re #9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Hill, Charles)
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Blake Thurman re #9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Hill, Charles)
July 23, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Alan Syler re #9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Hill, Charles)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RULE 26(f) ORDER: ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable but not later than August 14, 2019, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/23/2019. (kh, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Dennis Meeks, David Anderson, Alan Syler, Blake Thurman, Scott Ractz, Todd Grimes; Corporate Disclosures due by 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(wcl, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to David Anderson with the following notation, "Return To Sender, Attempted - Not Known, Unable To Forward"; counsel is notified via this notice regarding unperfected service. (wcl, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by David Anderson, Todd Grimes, Dennis Meeks, Scott Ractz, Alan Syler, Blake Thurman.(Hill, Charles)
July 22, 2019 ***PURSUANT TO THE #7 ANSWER - Attorney Ashley Hawkins Freeman for David Anderson, Todd Grimes, Dennis Meeks, Scott Ractz, Alan Syler, and Blake Thurman added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons and complaint signed by Laura Hudson for Alan Syler served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (dmn, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and Complaint signed by Laura Hudson for: David Anderson served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019; Todd Grimes served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019; Scott Ractz served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019; Blake Thurman served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (wcl, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and Complaint signed by Altheia Meeks for Dennis Meeks served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (wcl, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to David Anderson, Todd Grimes, Dennis Meeks, Scott Ractz, Alan Syler, Blake Thurman; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (wcl, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Andrew Vidich. (wcl, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Anderson, Todd Grimes, Dennis Meeks, Scott Ractz, Alan Syler, Blake Thurman (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602054004.), filed by Andrew Vidich. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt) (wcl, )
June 24, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Andrew Vidich. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vidich v. Meeks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Vidich
Represented By: Amardo Wesley Pitters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Ractz
Represented By: Ashley Hawkins Freeman
Represented By: Blake Edward Brookshire
Represented By: Charles Richard Hill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Meeks
Represented By: Ashley Hawkins Freeman
Represented By: Blake Edward Brookshire
Represented By: Charles Richard Hill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Anderson
Represented By: Ashley Hawkins Freeman
Represented By: Blake Edward Brookshire
Represented By: Charles Richard Hill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Syler
Represented By: Ashley Hawkins Freeman
Represented By: Blake Edward Brookshire
Represented By: Charles Richard Hill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Grimes
Represented By: Ashley Hawkins Freeman
Represented By: Blake Edward Brookshire
Represented By: Charles Richard Hill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Thurman
Represented By: Ashley Hawkins Freeman
Represented By: Blake Edward Brookshire
Represented By: Charles Richard Hill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?