Greymorr Real Estate LLC v. Foster et al
Plaintiff: Greymorr Real Estate LLC
Defendant: The State of Alabama Department of Revenue, Stanley D. Foster, The United States of America and Montgomery Anesthesia Associates, P.C.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00466
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Emily C Marks
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 #20 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default and file delivered to Clerk for review. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Stanley D. Foster by Greymorr Real Estate LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A USDC Docket, #2 Exhibit B State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit C Laughlin Affidavit, #4 Exhibit D Hereford Affidavit)(Hereford, William)
August 29, 2019 Filing 20 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default by Greymorr Real Estate LLC against Stanley D. Foster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A USDC Docket, #2 Exhibit B State Court Docket)(Hereford, William)
August 23, 2019 Filing 19 Response to Order re #11 Order to Show Cause by The State of Alabama Department of Revenue. (Bell, Sarah) Modified on 8/23/2019 to add the link to the #11 Order and to clarify the docket text (wcl, ).
August 23, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint, by The State of Alabama Department of Revenue.(Bell, Sarah)
August 23, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by The State of Alabama Department of Revenue. (Bell, Sarah)
August 22, 2019 Filing 16 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks as presiding judge and Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker as referral judge; Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (wcl, )
August 22, 2019 Motions No Longer Referred to US Magistrate Judge Susan Russ Walker: #10 MOTION to Dismiss State of Alabama Department of Revenue, #13 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Stanley D. Foster. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to reassign this case to a district judge. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 8/22/2019. (wcl, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint, by The United States of America.(Wadsworth, Stephen)
July 24, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Stanley D. Foster by Greymorr Real Estate LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Federal Docket, #2 Exhibit B State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit C Laughlin Affidavit, #4 Exhibit D Hereford Affidavit, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Hereford, William)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Montgomery Anesthesia Associates, P.C. and returned to counsel for personal service. (kh, )
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Upon consideration of plaintiff's motion for order dismissing State of Alabama Department of Revenue, see Doc. #10 , it is ORDERED that defendants shall show cause on or before August 1, 2019, why plaintiff's motion for order dismissing State of Alabama Department of Revenue should not be GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 7/19/2019. (kh, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss State of Alabama Department of Revenue by Greymorr Real Estate LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hereford, William)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Greymorr Real Estate LLC. (Hereford, William)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Greymorr Real Estate LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Tax Deed, #2 Exhibit B Greymorr Quitclaim Deed, #3 Exhibit C Foster Quitclaim Deed, #4 Exhibit D Fed Tax Liens, #5 Exhibit E Montgomery Anesthesia Judgment, #6 Exhibit F Sheriff's Deed, #7 Summons to Montgomery Anesthesia)(Hereford, William)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion For Extension of Time. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 7/10/2019. (no pdf document attached to this entry)(kh, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Response by The United States of America. (Wadsworth, Stephen)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Greymorr Real Estate LLC. (wcl, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for The State of Alabama Department of Revenue, The United States of America. (wcl, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by The United States of America. (wcl, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing to State Court by The United States of America re: filing of #1 Notice of Removal. (wcl, )
July 1, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint by The State of Alabama Department of Revenue. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, )
July 1, 2019 COMPLAINT against Stanley D. Foster, The State of Alabama Department of Revenue, The United States of America, filed by Greymorr Real Estate LLC. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The United States of America from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, Alabama, case number 03-cv-19-901013.00. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Answer - AL Dept of Revenue, #3 Exhibit 1 - State Court Record, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greymorr Real Estate LLC v. Foster et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greymorr Real Estate LLC
Represented By: William Schley Hereford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of Alabama Department of Revenue
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley D. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Represented By: Stephen D Wadsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery Anesthesia Associates, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?