Motley v. Taylor
Plaintiff: Sharon Motley
Defendant: Hal Taylor
Case Number: 2:2019cv00478
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY BRIEF in Support re #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Hal Taylor. (Chynoweth, Brad) Modified on 8/23/2019 to clarify the docket text as a "Reply Brief" & not a "Reply to Response to Motion" (alm, ).
August 16, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY in Support re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sharon Motley. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Micah West)(West, Micah) Modified on 8/19/2019 to clarify the docket text (alm, ).
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting #19 First Amended MOTION for Danielle Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/26/2019. (No PDF attached to this entry) (alm, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 19 First Amended MOTION for Danielle Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Sharon Motley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(West, Micah)
July 25, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Correction re #16 BRIEF in Support, to attach a corrected PDF document to include the "Table of Authorities" section of the pleading which was erroneously omitted from the original filing. (Attachments: #1 Main PDF to Document #16 )(alm, )
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 BRIEFING ORDER re #14 Motion to Dismiss: it is ORDERED that the motion be submitted without oral argument on 8/23/2019; further ORDERED that the plf file a response, which shall include a brief, on or before 8/16/2019; The dft may file a reply brief on or before 8/23/2019, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/25/2019. (alm, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 16 Consolidated BRIEF in Support re #14 MOTION to Dismiss and in Opposition to Plaintiff's #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Hal Taylor. (Chynoweth, Brad) (Main Document 16 replaced on 7/25/2019 to attach a corrected PDF document to include the "Table of Authorities" section of the pleading which was erroneously omitted from the original filing) (alm, ). Modified on 7/25/2019 to add the link to the #3 Motion (alm, ).
July 24, 2019 ***PURSUANT TO THE #14 MOTION - Attorney Laura Elizabeth Howell for Hal Taylor added. (No PDF attached to this entry) (alm, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Hal Taylor. (Chynoweth, Brad)
July 24, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Hal Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Chynoweth, Brad)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying without prejudice #10 MOTION for Danielle Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/24/2019. (alm, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Correction re #10 MOTION for Danielle Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to attached a corrected certificate of good standing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Doc #10 )(alm, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee received re #10 Motion: $ 75.00, receipt number 4602054289. (alm, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Danielle Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sharon Motley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(West, Micah) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/24/2019 to attached a corrected certificate of good standing) (alm, ). Modified on 7/24/2019 (alm, ).
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Sharon Motley; Hal Taylor served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (West, Micah)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Hal Taylor & returned to counsel for personal service by process server. (alm, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Micah West in Support re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction & #5 MOTION for Class Certification. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit S, #18 Exhibit T, #19 Exhibit W, #20 Exhibit X, #21 Exhibit Y)(alm, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support re #5 MOTION for Class Certification filed by Sharon Motley. (alm, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Class Certification filed by Sharon Motley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sharon Motley)(alm, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sharon Motley. (alm, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sharon Motley. (Attachment(s): #1 Text of Proposed Order (alm, ) (alm, ). Modified on 7/8/2019 to attach the proposed order (alm, ).
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement filed by Sharon Motley. (alm, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Hal Taylor (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602054117), filed by Sharon Motley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(alm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Motley v. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Motley
Represented By: Micah West
Represented By: Sara Michelle Zampierin
Represented By: Danielle Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hal Taylor
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Howell
Represented By: Brad A. Chynoweth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?