Rodgers v. Wexford Health Sources, Inc. et al (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: Seth Rodgers
Defendant: Wilcott Rhamning and Wexford Health Sources, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00501
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 AO FORM 85 mailed to counsel for Wilcott Rhamning, Wexford Health Sources, Inc. (no pdf document attached to this entry)(kh, )
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDERED that this #10 motion be and is hereby GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the defendants be GRANTED an extension from August 26, 2019 to and including October 2, 2019 to file their special report and answer. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 8/26/2019. (kh, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Wexford Health Sources, Inc.. (Hill, Charles)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Wilcott Rhamning. (Hill, Charles)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Special Report & Answer by Wilcott Rhamning, Wexford Health Sources, Inc.. (Hill, Charles)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 complaint and #4 order signed by David Reed for Wilcott Rhamning served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (kh, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint and #4 order signed by (illegible) for Wexford Health Sources, Inc. served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (kh, )
July 23, 2019 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; #1 Complaint and #4 Order sent to Wilcott Rhamning was returned with the following notation, "Return To Sender, No Mail Receptacle, Unable to Forward" (No pdf attached to this entry) (kh, )
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED that the #6 motion for appointment of counsel be and is hereby DENIED. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 7/17/2019. (kh, )
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED that the above styled case shall henceforth proceed only on those claims related to medical treatment provided by the defendants. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 7/17/2019. (kh, )
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT AND FILE on or before August 26, 2019; copies mailed to plaintiff; mailed by CMRRR with complaint to named defendants Dr. Wilcott Rhaming and General Counsel for Wexford Health Sources, Inc. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 7/17/2019. (kh, )
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Easterling Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 7/17/2019. (furn: acct clerk, cashier) (kh, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Seth Rodgers. (dmn, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Seth Rodgers. (arc, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Wilcott Rhamning, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., filed by Seth Rodgers. (Attachments: #1 Statement)(arc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodgers v. Wexford Health Sources, Inc. et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilcott Rhamning
Represented By: Charles Richard Hill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Sources, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Richard Hill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seth Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?