Thompkins v. Alabama Department of Corrections et al (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: Henry L. Thompkins
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections, Staton Correctional Facility, Bullock Correctional Facility and Ventress Correctional Facility
Case Number: 2:2019cv00504
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Charles S Coody
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 Initial Partial Filing fee Received: $58.00, receipt number 4602054786. (am, )
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FINAL JUDGMENT, in accordance with the prior proceedings, opinions, and orders of the court, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice; directing the Clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the FRCP. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/4/20119. (Attachments: #1 civil appeals checklist)(djy, )
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ADOPTING the #4 Recommendation and DISMISSING this action without prejudice; Final judgment will be entered separately. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/4/2019. (am, )
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that this case be dismissed without prejudice for failure of the plaintiff to pay the initial partial filing fee in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1)(A) as ordered by this court; Objections to R&R due by 8/27/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 8/13/2019. (am, )
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON MOTION GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Payment of initial partial filing fee of $44.67 be paid on or before 8/5/2019; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Bullock Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 7/17/2019. (Furnished to Cashier) (am, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Henry L. Thompkins. (bes, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/23/2019: #1 Original Ink Signature Page) (am, ).
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Alabama Department of Corrections, Bullock Correctional Facility, Staton Correctional Facility, Ventress Correctional Facility, filed by Henry L. Thompkins. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(bes, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompkins v. Alabama Department of Corrections et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry L. Thompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staton Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bullock Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ventress Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?