Barron v. Elmcroft of Montgomery, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Susan Barron
Defendant: Eclipse Senior Living, Inc. and Elmcroft of Montgomery, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00513
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Correction re #8 Joint Status Report, to remove filed by "defendants" and to clarify as filed by defendant Eclipse Senior Living, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Main PDF docket entry #8 )(cnw, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Eclipse Senior Living, Inc., Susan Barron. (Bates, Reed) Modified on 9/17/2019 to clarify as joint, to remove Elmcroft of Montgomery, LLC as a filer and to add as also filed on behalf of plf(cnw, ). (Main Document 8 replaced on 9/17/2019 to remove filed by "defendants" and to clarify as filed by defendant Eclipse Senior Living, Inc) (cnw, ).
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Susan Barron re #5 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Sawyer, Jon)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines Pending Outcome of Mediation. This case is STAYED generally pending the outcome of mediation, which is to be conducted on 9/9/2019. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before 9/16/2019, notifying the Court as to the outcome of mediation. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 8/1/2019. (No pdf attached to this entry)(cnw, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Susan Barron; Corporate Disclosures due by 8/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Disclosure Statement)(cnw, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (plf) Susan Barron, (def) Eclipse Senior Living, Inc. (cnw, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines Pending Outcome of Mediation by Eclipse Senior Living, Inc., Susan Barron (Bates, Reed) Modified on 7/26/2019 to clarify text to reflect as also filed on behalf of plf (cnw, ).
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Eclipse Senior Living, Inc.. (Still, Stephen)
July 22, 2019 NOTICE of Filing to State Court by Eclipse Senior Living, Inc. re #3 Notice of Removal.(No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #3 for pdf) (cnw, )
July 22, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Susan Barron.(No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #3 for pdf) (cnw, )
July 22, 2019 COMPLAINT against Eclipse Senior Living, Inc., Elmcroft of Montgomery, LLC, filed by Susan Barron. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #3 for pdf)(cnw, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Eclipse Senior Living, Inc. from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, case number 03-cv-19-901179. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602054293) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1- State Court Record, #3 Exhibit 2- Affidavit, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Copy of Notice to State Court, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 receipt)(cnw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barron v. Elmcroft of Montgomery, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eclipse Senior Living, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Wright Still, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Robertson Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elmcroft of Montgomery, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Barron
Represented By: Jon Paul Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?