Butler v. Dunn et al
Plaintiff: Byron Butler
Defendant: Lagunita Franchise Operations, LLC and Damon Dunn
Case Number: 2:2019cv00530
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Brasher
Referring Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STANDARD BRIEFING ORDER: Briefing deadlines and instructions for all pending and future motions. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 9/20/2019. (cnw, )
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER denying as moot #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 9/13/2019. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 16 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher as presiding Judge and Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle as referral Judge. Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle no longer assigned to the case as presiding Judge. (cnw, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 15 Renewed MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , by Damon Dunn, Lagunita Franchise Operations, LLC. (Rafferty, Loren) Modified on 9/11/2019 clarify the docket text and to add the links to the #9 Motion & #14 Amended Complaint (cnw, ).
September 3, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Byron Butler. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #14 for pdf) (cnw, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Byron Butler, filed by Byron Butler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stone, Moses) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/4/2019: #2 Corrected Certificate of Service) (cnw, ).
August 22, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Damon Dunn, Lagunita Franchise Operations, LLC. (Rafferty, Loren) Modified on 8/22/2019 to clarify text to reflect as satifying #11 notice of deficiency (cnw, ).
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by the Plf, if any there be, as to why the #9 Motion to Dismiss should not be granted; Show Cause Response due by 9/5/2019; Dfts may reply on or before 9/19/2019; any party wishing to consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction shall complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 9/5/2019, as further set out in order; Do NOT electronically file the consent form nor reassignment form into the record. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 8/15/2019. (wcl, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Damon Dunn, Lagunita Franchise Operations, LLC; Corporate Disclosures due by 8/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(wcl, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Damon Dunn, Lagunita Franchise Operations, LLC. (wcl, )
August 13, 2019 BRIEF in Support re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Supporting Brief filed by Damon Dunn, Lagunita Franchise Operations, LLC. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #9 for pdf) (wcl, )
August 13, 2019 ***PURSUANT TO THE #9 MOTION - Attorney Allen Eugene Graham for Damon Dunn and Lagunita Franchise Operations, LLC added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Supporting Brief by Damon Dunn, Lagunita Franchise Operations, LLC. (Rafferty, Loren)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Correction re #7 Notice of Appearance, to attach a corrected PDF document to correct the style of the case and to correct the certificate of service. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Main PDF docket entry #7 )(cnw, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Hoyt Gregory Harp on behalf of Byron Butler (Harp, Hoyt) (Main Document 7 replaced on 8/6/2019) (cnw, ). Modified on 8/6/2019 to attach a corrected PDF document to correct the style of the case and to correct the certificate of service (cnw, ).
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint and #3 Summons, signed by Kelly Webster for Damon Dunn, served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (cnw, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #3 Summons, signed by Kelly Webster for Lagunita Franchise Operations, LLC, served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (cnw, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (PLF) Byron Butler. (cnw, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Damon Dunn, Lagunita Franchise Operations, LLC.; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (cnw, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Byron Butler. (cnw, )
July 24, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Byron Butler. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf) (cnw, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Damon Dunn, Lagunita Franchise Operations, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602054318.), filed by Byron Butler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 receipt)(cnw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. Dunn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron Butler
Represented By: Moses O Stone
Represented By: Hoyt Gregory Harp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lagunita Franchise Operations, LLC
Represented By: Loren Amanda Rafferty
Represented By: Allen Eugene Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damon Dunn
Represented By: Loren Amanda Rafferty
Represented By: Allen Eugene Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?