Slayton et al v. Route 380 Transport, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ronny Joe Slayton and Sonya Slayton
Defendant: Oscar Villatoro Gramajo and Route 380 Transport, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00569
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Oscar Villatoro Gramajo. (Ross, Brett)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Route 380 Transport, LLC. (Ross, Brett)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Sonya Slayton. (Ingram, Samuel) Modified on 9/9/2019 to remove Ronny Joe Slayton as a filer, selected in error. (dmn, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Ronny Joe Slayton. (Ingram, Samuel)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for All parties Oscar Villatoro Gramajo, Route 380 Transport, LLC, Ronny Joe Slayton, Sonya Slayton. (dmn, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Route 380 Transport, LLC.(dmn, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/12/2019: #1 Correct Certificate of Service) (dmn, ).
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Oscar Villatoro Gramajo.(dmn, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/12/2019: #1 Correct Certificate of Service) (dmn, ).
August 8, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ronny Joe Slayton, Sonya Slayton. (dmn, ) (NO PDF, see Doc. #1 for pdf.)
August 8, 2019 COMPLAINT against Oscar Villatoro Gramajo, Route 380 Transport, LLC, filed by Ronny Joe Slayton, Sonya Slayton.(dmn, ) (NO PDF, see Doc. #1 for pdf.)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Oscar Villatoro Gramajo, Route 380 Transport, LLC from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, Alabama, case number 03-CV-19-901249.00. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602054516) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Filing Fee Receipt, #4 State Court Complaint)(dmn, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/12/2019: #5 Correct Certificate of Service) (dmn, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slayton et al v. Route 380 Transport, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oscar Villatoro Gramajo
Represented By: Brett A. Ross
Represented By: Elizabeth Larsen Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Route 380 Transport, LLC
Represented By: Brett A. Ross
Represented By: Elizabeth Larsen Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronny Joe Slayton
Represented By: Samuel Marvin Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonya Slayton
Represented By: Samuel Marvin Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?