Duffy v. Federal Bureau of Investigation et al(MAG+)
Plaintiff: Mujaahida Duffy
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation and James E. Jewell
Case Number: 2:2019cv00589
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' #25 Motion for Extension of Time, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #1 ) on or before 10/29/2019. Answer due from Federal Bureau of Investigation and James E. Jewell on 10/29/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 8/29/2019. (dmn, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Federal Bureau of Investigation, James E. Jewell. (Miller, Samantha) Modified on 8/28/2019 to reflect proper title and event. (dmn, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 24 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Federal Bureau of Investigation, James E. Jewell. (Miller, Samantha)
August 28, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha R. Miller on behalf of Federal Bureau of Investigation, James E. Jewell (Miller, Samantha)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge: For good cause shown, it is ORDERED that, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636, this case is referred to the United States Magistrate Judge Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 8/21/2019. (dmn, )
August 15, 2019 Case transferred in electronically from USDC, Northern District of Florida; Case Number 3:18-cv-2156-RV-HTC. Electronically transferred via CM/ECF to Clerk. (dmn, ) (NO PDF)
August 15, 2019 Filing 21 Interdistrict Transfer to the MIDDLE DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, DOTHAN Division, located at 100 WEST TROY STREET, DOTHAN, AL 36303. (dmn, ) (NO PDF)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER entered by USDC/NDFL adopting Magistrate Judge's #19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The parties' Joint Motion to Transfer (doc. #18 ) is GRANTED. The clerk shall TRANSFER this case to the USDC/MDAL. The clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROBERT VINSON on 8/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certified Docket Sheet)(dmn, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION entered by USDC/NDFL - That the Parties' Joint Motion to Transfer (ECF Doc. #18 ) be GRANTED. That the clerk TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Alabama. That the clerk be directed to close this case. R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T. CANNON on 7/15/2019. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier; 8/12/2019. (dmn, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 18 JOINT MOTION to Transfer Case to USDC for the Middle District of Alabama by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, JAMES E. JEWELL. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 7/26/2019). (dmn, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by ZACK SMITH on behalf of All Defendants. (dmn, )
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER entered by USDC/NDFL. Plaintiff's Motion to Clarify and Remove One Plaintiff (ECF Doc. #15 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as set forth above. The Clerk is directed to docket the Plaintiffs' Motion (ECF Doc. #15 ) as a Motion to Clarify and Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The Clerk is directed to terminate Renfro as a party plaintiff. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T. CANNON on 7/2/219. (dmn, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Clarify and Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by by Mujaahida Duffy. (dmn, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 14 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to JACK WARD RENFROE at 5205 STATE HWY 153, SAMSON, AL 36477-8313 Re: #7 DISCHARGED PER #13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. (RETURN TO SENDER: ATTEMPTED NOT KNOWN; UNABLE TO FORWARD). (dmn, )
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER entered by USDC/NDFL. Based on the Plaintiffs' representations regarding service as contained in the amended response, and without determining whether service was proper, the show cause order entered on 4/22/2019 (ECF Doc. #7 ) is DISCHARGED. Plaintiffs' Motion to Clarify (ECF Doc. #11 ) is DENIED as moot. The clerk shall refer this matter to the undersigned if no response to the complaint has been filed within sixty (60) days of the date of this order. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T. CANNON on 5/14/2019. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if no response not filed earlier: 7/15/2019.) (dmn, )
April 30, 2019 Filing 12 Plaintiff's AMENDED RESPONSE TO #7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Mujaahida Duffy, Jack Ward Renfro. (dmn, )
April 29, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Clarify by JACK WARD RENFRO. (dmn, )
April 29, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO #7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Mujaahida Duffy, Jack Ward Renfro. (dmn, )
April 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE to Court of Service of Proof of Service to Defendants Counsel, by JACK WARD RENFRO. (dmn, )
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by JACK WARD RENFRO. (New address: P O BOX 1151, PAXTON, FL 32538). (dmn, )
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DISCHARGED PER #13 ORDER. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE entered by USDC/NDFL. Plaintiffs shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of this order to show cause why this matter should not be dismissed pursuant to FRCP 4 for failure to timely effect service of process. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T. CANNON. (Mailed to both Plaintiffs). Modified on 5/15/2019. (dmn, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to JACK WARD RENFRO Re: #5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. (RETURN TO SENDER; NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED; UNABLE TO FORWARD). (dmn, )
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER entered by USDC/NDFL REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T. CANNON for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J. KAHN, JR. no longer assigned to the case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E. WALKER on 3/1/2019. **Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 3:18cv2156-RV/HTC. (dmn, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed. James E. Jewell served on 12/6/2018, answer due 2/4/2019. (dmn, )
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, James E. Jewell. (dmn, ) (NO PDF)
October 12, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE to Pro Se litigants Jack Ward Renfro and Mujaahida Duffy. (dmn, ) (NO PDF)
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau of Investigation, James E. Jewell ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number FLN3-12292.), filed by Mujaahida Duffy.(dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duffy v. Federal Bureau of Investigation et al(MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mujaahida Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Represented By: Thomas Zachary Smith
Represented By: Samantha R. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Jewell
Represented By: Thomas Zachary Smith
Represented By: Samantha R. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?