Smith v. Subway Inc. et al (MAG+)
Plaintiff: Peter J. Smith
Defendant: Retirement Systems of Alabama, Subway Inc., RSA Security and David Bronner
Case Number: 2:2019cv00592
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Brasher
Referring Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
2 Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; DIRECTING the Clerk to stay service of the case pending the court's obligatory review of the complaint pursuant to 28 USC 1915(e). Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 9/12/2019. (wcl, )
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE, pursuant to 28 USC 636, to Magistrate Judge Honorable Stephen Michael Doyle for all pretrial proceedings and entry of any orders or recommendations as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 8/20/2019. (wcl, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 DECLARATION of the pro se party to Participate in the Pro Se Assistance Program by Peter J. Smith. (wcl, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 INFORMATION of the pro se party for Participation in the Pro Se Assistance Program by Peter J. Smith. (wcl, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Peter J. Smith. (wcl, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Peter J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(wcl, )
August 16, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Peter J. Smith. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Bronner, RSA Security, Retirement Systems of Alabama, Subway Inc., filed by Peter J. Smith. (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Subway Inc. et al (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Retirement Systems of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Subway Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSA Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bronner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?