Steiger v. Simmons(INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: Bradley Joseph Steiger
Defendant: United States Probation Office, Derrick Cunningham and Marcus Simmons
Case Number: 2:2019cv00599
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Brasher
Referring Judge: Charles S Coody
2 Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
3 Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Marcus Simmons, U.S. Attorney and mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus and #8 Order.(kh, )
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ON MOTION: Upon consideration of Petitioner's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #4 ), and in light of the filing fee received September 23, 2019 (see Doc. [6), it is ORDERED that the motion is DENIED as moot. Upon consideration of the motion for declaratory judgment filed by Petitioner, considered a motion to amend the petition regarding matters associated with the validity of a term of imprisonment Petitioner served on a state sentence, it is ORDERED that the motion (Doc. #5 ) is DENIED. ORDER TO ANSWER habeas petition on or before November 5, 2019 to the to the United States Attorney for the Middle District of Alabama and to Marcus Simmons, Senior United States Probation Officer, Middle District of Alabama. Copy mailed to petitioner; mailed CMRRR w/copies of petition and summons to US Attorney and Officer Simmons, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 10/15/2019. (kh, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Bradley Joseph Steiger (djy, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 Filing fee received for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus: $ 5.00, receipt number 4602054996 (kh, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment by Bradley Joseph Steiger. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(dmn, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 Application with Prisoner Account Statement to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Bradley Joseph Steiger. (dmn, )
September 10, 2019 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. #2 Notice of Reassignment mailed to Bradley Joseph Steiger returned by USPS with the following notation, "Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward." (dmn, ) (NO PDF)
August 30, 2019 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. #2 Notice of Reassignment mailed to Bradley Joseph Steiger returned by USPS with the following notation, "Return to Sender, No Longer Here." Document remailed to current address noted on docket. (dmn, ) (NO PDF)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that on or before 9/10/2019, Petitioner shall file either the $5.00 filing fee or an affidavit in support of a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by relevant financial information from the inmate account clerk. It is further ORDERED that the motion to seal (Doc. #1 ) is DENIED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to furnish Petitioner with a form for use in requesting leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to amend the court docket to reflect that the proper respondent is Sheriff Derrick Cunningham, Montgomery County Detention Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 8/27/2019. Copy with IFP form mailed to Petitioner as directed. (dmn, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 Case reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks and Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle. Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher, and Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody no longer assigned to the case. (dmn, )
August 20, 2019 MOTION to Seal Proceedings by Bradley Joseph Steiger. (dmn, ) (NO PDF, see Doc. #1 for pdf.)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Bradley Joseph Steiger. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2)(es, ) Modified on 8/27/2019 to correct file date. (dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steiger v. Simmons(INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Probation Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derrick Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Joseph Steiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?