Parks Pharmacy, Inc. et al v. OptumRx, Inc.
Plaintiff: Demetrius Yvonne Parks and Parks Pharmacy, Inc.
Defendant: Optum Services, Inc., Optum and OptumRx, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00611
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
2 Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by OptumRx, Inc.. (Allan, Aria)
October 11, 2019 Filing 16 Case reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks and Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle. Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (djy, )
October 11, 2019 Motions No Longer Referred, case reassigned: #12 MOTION to Compel Motion to Compel Defendant to Cease Abusive Discovery Tactics, #9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (djy, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 15 Reply to response to order to show cause Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Demetrius Yvonne Parks, Parks Pharmacy, Inc.. (Finney, Tanika)
September 30, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Compel Motion to Compel Defendant to Cease Abusive Discovery Tactics filed by OptumRx, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Dwayne Luby)(Allan, Aria)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting def's #6 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits to Motion to Compel Arbitration Under Seal; further ORDERING that on or before 10/7/2019, plfs shall show cause, if any there be, why def's #9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration should not be granted; def may reply on or before 10/21/2019; ORDERING that on or before 9/30/2019, def shall show cause, if any there be, why plfs' #12 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Cease Abusive Discovery Tactics should not be granted; plfs may reply on or before 10/14/2019; directing any party wishing to consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction shall complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the clerk on or before 10/7/2019, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 9/16/19. (djy, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Compel Motion to Compel Defendant to Cease Abusive Discovery Tactics by Demetrius Yvonne Parks, Parks Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Finney, Tanika)
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Demetrius Yvonne Parks, Parks Pharmacy, Inc.. (Finney, Tanika)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF FILING by OptumRx, Inc. re #9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(kh, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Optum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Kyle Thomas, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Kyle Thomas (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Kyle Thomas (Filed Under Seal), #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Kyle Thomas)(Allan, Aria)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to why #6 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits to Motion to Compel Arbitration Under Seal. Show Cause Response due by 9/6/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 8/29/2019. (no pdf document attached to this entry)(kh, )
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #4 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, to Correct Party Name. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 8/29/2019. (no pdf document attached to this entry) (kh, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits to Motion to Compel Arbitration Under Seal by Optum. (Allan, Aria)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Optum. (Allan, Aria)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, to Correct Party Name by Optum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Allan, Aria)
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Optum, Demetrius Yvonne Parks, Parks Pharmacy, Inc. (kh, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Optum. (kh, )
August 22, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Demetrius Yvonne Parks, Parks Pharmacy, Inc.. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
August 22, 2019 COMPLAINT against Optum, filed by Parks Pharmacy, Inc., Demetrius Yvonne Parks.(no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Optum, from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, Alabama, case number 03-CV-2019-901387.00. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602054666) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parks Pharmacy, Inc. et al v. OptumRx, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum Services, Inc.
Represented By: Cavender Crosby Kimble
Represented By: Aria Bianca Allan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum
Represented By: Cavender Crosby Kimble
Represented By: Aria Bianca Allan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRx, Inc.
Represented By: Cavender Crosby Kimble
Represented By: Aria Bianca Allan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrius Yvonne Parks
Represented By: Julian Lenwood McPhillips, Jr.
Represented By: Tanika Larosa Lakes Finney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parks Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Julian Lenwood McPhillips, Jr.
Represented By: Tanika Larosa Lakes Finney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?