Moore v. Jamison et al (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: Charles Eugene Moore
Defendant: Joey Craig and Leroy Jamison
Case Number: 2:2019cv00612
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Charles S Coody
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before 10/28/2019, General Counsel for the ALDOC shall contact appropriate officials at Kilby to determine if any video recording of the alleged incident is available and, if such recording is available, ensure that the recording is preserved for submission to this court; further ORDERED that on or before 11/4/2019, General Counsel for the ALDOC shall file a notice with this court advising of the results of the inquiry addressed in this order; DIRECTING the Clerk to provide a copy of this order via certified mail to the General Counsel for the ALDOC. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/16/2019. (Copy mailed CMRRR as directed) (amf, )
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the plf be GRANTED an extension from 10/24/2019 to and including 11/15/2019 to pay the $11.17 initial partial filing fee, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/16/2019. (Furnished: Cashier) (amf, )
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER withdrawing the #5 Recommendation; It is ORDERED that the plf be GRANTED an extension to and including 10/24/2019 to pay the initial partial filing fee, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/3/2019. (amf, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 OBJECTION to #5 Report and Recommendation by Charles Eugene Moore. (amf, )
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S #7 ORDER) RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that this case be dismissed without prejudice for failure of the plf to pay the initial partial filing fee in accordance with the provisions of 28 USC 1915(b)(1)(A) as ordered by this court; Objections to R&R due by 10/10/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 9/26/2019. (amf, ) Modified on 10/3/2019 (amf, ).
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON MOTION: ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $11.17 be paid on or before 9/16/2019; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Copies mailed to plf and account clerk at Kilby CF. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 8/26/2019. (Furnished: Cashier) (alm, )
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #1 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; further ORDERED that the above-styled action is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge pursuant to 28 USC 636 for further proceedings and determination or recommendation as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 8/23/2019. (alm, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Charles Eugene Moore. (bes, )
August 23, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Charles Eugene Moore. (No PDF Attached - See Docket Entry #1 ) (bes, )
August 23, 2019 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Charles Eugene Moore. (No PDF Attached - See Docket Entry #1 ) (bes, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Joey Craig, Leroy Jamison, filed by Charles Eugene Moore.(bes, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Jamison et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joey Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Jamison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Eugene Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?