Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc. v. Simmons
Plaintiff: Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: Franklin Bruce Simmons, III
Case Number: 2:2019cv00614
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Franklin Bruce Simmons, III. (NO PDF attached to this entry - See doc #11 ) (am, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and, COUNTERCLAIM against Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc. by Franklin Bruce Simmons, III.(Centeno, Douglas)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Franklin Bruce Simmons, III re #9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Centeno, Douglas)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Franklin Bruce Simmons, III; Corporate Disclosures due by 10/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Format)(am, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Franklin Bruce Simmons, III. (am, )
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time; def may file an answer or a responsive pleading on or before 10/8/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 9/23/19. (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Franklin Bruce Simmons, III. (Centeno, Douglas)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc.. Franklin Bruce Simmons, III served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (Sefton, Patrick)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Franklin Bruce Simmons, III and returned to counsel for personal service. (am, )
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc. (am, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate and Conflict Disclosure Statement, filed by Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc. (am, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Franklin Bruce Simmons, III, filed by Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc. (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number 4602054680.) (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Receipt)(am, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc. v. Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin Bruce Simmons, III
Represented By: Douglas J Centeno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Ladd Wheeler Sefton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?