The Municipality of Troy v. Wilke (MAG+)
Plaintiff: The Municipality of Troy
Defendant: Larry Ayers Wilke
Counter Defendant: Haley Helena Robinson
Case Number: 2:2019cv00631
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Separate the Request for Consolidation by Larry Ayers Wilke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(kh, )
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE (Correspondence) by Larry Ayers Wilke (kh, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE (Correspondence) by Larry Ayers Wilke (kh, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Consolidate and To Amend the Consolidation If Granted by Larry Ayers Wilke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(kh, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION For A Stay in All Court Proceedings by Larry Ayers Wilke. (kh, )
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 9/11/2019. (kh, )
September 3, 2019 COUNTERCLAIM against Haley Helena Robinson, filed by Larry Ayers Wilke. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, )
September 3, 2019 COMPLAINT against Larry Ayers Wilke, filed by The Municipality of Troy. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Larry Ayers Wilke from Municipal Court of Troy, Alabama, case number 19N0456. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602054772) (Attachments: #1 Municipal Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Receipt) (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Municipality of Troy v. Wilke (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Ayers Wilke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Municipality of Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Haley Helena Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?