Cobble v. United States of America et al (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: Daniel Eric Cobble
Defendant: United States of America and Georgia Department of Corrections
Case Number: 2:2019cv00642
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Brasher
Referring Judge: Charles S Coody
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3720
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 USCA Case Number 19-14034-H for #7 Notice of Appeal filed by Daniel Eric Cobble. Fee Status: PLRA 3 Strikes. No hearings to be transcribed. (dmn, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 Transmission of #7 Notice of Appeal, #6 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis, #5 Opinion and Order, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet and Appeal Record)(dmn, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Daniel Eric Cobble as to #5 Opinion and Order entered 9/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 USCA Cover Letter)(dmn, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Daniel Eric Cobble. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 USCA Cover Letter)(dmn, )
September 30, 2019 Received email from MD/GA regarding receipt of e-transfer case; MD/GA case number assigned as 1:19-mc-16-LJA. (No pdf attached to this entry). (amf, )
September 23, 2019 Case transferred to the Middle District of Georgia; ELECTRONICALLY transferred via CM/ECF transfer to Clerk. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED that: 1) The U.S. Magistrate Judge's #3 recommendation is adopted; 2) This case is transferred to the U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia; DIRECTING the Clerk to take all such action as is required to effect the transfer; This case is closed in this court. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 9/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(amf, ) (Main Document 5 replaced on 9/23/2019 to reflect the proper signature date of 9/23/2019 & not 9/13/2019) (amf, ). Modified on 9/23/2019 (amf, ).
September 19, 2019 Objection to #2 Order filed by Daniel Eric Cobble. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #4 for PDF) (amf, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 OBJECTION to #3 Report and Recommendation by Daniel Eric Cobble. (amf, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that this case be transferred to the US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 1406(a); Objections to R&R due by 9/25/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 9/11/19. (djy, )
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER ON MOTION denying #1 Motion to Not Transfer this Case to Georgia. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 9/10/2019. (wcl, )
September 5, 2019 MOTION to Not Transfer this Case to Georgia by Daniel Eric Cobble. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, )
September 5, 2019 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Daniel Eric Cobble. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, )
September 5, 2019 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Daniel Eric Cobble. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, )
September 5, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Daniel Eric Cobble. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Georgia Department of Corrections, United States of America, filed by Daniel Eric Cobble. (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cobble v. United States of America et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Eric Cobble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?