Wilcox v. Andalusia City Schools Board of Education et al
Plaintiff: Kennadie Grace Wilcox
Defendant: Andalusia City Schools Board of Education, Daniel Shakespeare and Ted Watson
Case Number: 2:2019cv00650
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Brasher
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/8/2021; Final Pretrial Conference before Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher set for 1/15/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 2E, the FMJ US Courthouse, Montgomery, AL; This cause is set for jury selection and trial before Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher during the term of court commencing on 2/22/2021, at 10:00 a.m. in Montgomery, AL; Amended Pleadings due by 12/23/2019; Discovery due by 6/26/2020. Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 7/24/2020; Mediation Notice due by 7/1/2020, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 10/24/2019. (furn: calendar, dh)(cnw, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Watkins, Katherine)
October 9, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Ted Watson re #9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Watkins, Katherine) Modified on 10/9/2019 to remove Andalusia City Schools Board of Education, Daniel Shakespeare, as filers (cnw, ).
October 9, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Daniel Shakespeare re #9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Watkins, Katherine) Modified on 10/9/2019 to remove Andalusia City Schools Board of Education, Ted Watson as filers (cnw, ).
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Andalusia City Schools Board of Education, re #9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Watkins, Katherine) Modified on 10/9/2019 to remove Daniel Shakespeare, Ted Watson as filers (cnw, ).
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RULE 26(f) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the FRCP 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/30/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 10/9/2019. (cnw, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Andalusia City Schools Board of Education, Daniel Shakespeare, Ted Watson; Corporate Disclosures due by 10/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Disclosure Statement)(cnw, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Hortberg Watkins on behalf of Andalusia City Schools Board of Education, Daniel Shakespeare, Ted Watson (Watkins, Katherine)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Andalusia City Schools Board of Education, Daniel Shakespeare, Ted Watson.(Boardman, Mark)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Compliant & #3 Summons signed by David W. Becker for Ted Watson served on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (cnw, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Compliant & #3 Summons signed by Ann Shakespeare for Daniel Shakespeare served on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (cnw, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Compliant & #3 Summons signed by Kim Thompson for Andalusia City Schools Board of Education served on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (cnw, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Andalusia City Schools Board of Education, Daniel Shakespeare, Ted Watson, mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 complaint. (cnw, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Kennadie Grace Wilcox. (cnw, )
September 6, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Kennadie Grace Wilcox. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf) (cnw, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andalusia City Schools Board of Education, Daniel Shakespeare, Ted Watson ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602054828.), filed by Kennadie Grace Wilcox. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 receipt)(cnw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilcox v. Andalusia City Schools Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andalusia City Schools Board of Education
Represented By: Mark S. Boardman
Represented By: Katherine Hortberg Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Shakespeare
Represented By: Mark S. Boardman
Represented By: Katherine Hortberg Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Watson
Represented By: Mark S. Boardman
Represented By: Katherine Hortberg Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kennadie Grace Wilcox
Represented By: Joshua Stemle
Represented By: Brandy Murphy Lee
Represented By: Susan Nettles Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?