Willis v. United States of America et al (INMATE 3)
Plaintiff: Bernetta Lashay Willis
Defendant: P. Bradley and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv00651
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Charles S Coody
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Docket Status by Bernetta Lashay Willis. (kh, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett J. Talley on behalf of United States of America (Talley, Brett)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Petitioner has filed a document styled as a "Motion for Status/Relief. Vacate" (Doc. #8 ), which the court construes as a motion to expedite ruling on Petitioners motion to vacate, set aside, or correct sentence under 28 U.S.C. 2255. Upon consideration, it is ORDERED that Petitioners motion to expedite ruling (Doc. #8 ) is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/24/2019. (kh, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Status/Relief -> Vacate construed as a motion to expedite ruling on Petitioner's motion to vacate, set aside, or correct sentence under 28 U.S.C. 2255 in the court's #9 order by Bernetta Lashay Willis. (kh, )
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED that the #6 motion to amend is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the United States is GRANTED an extension to and including November 18, 2019, to file a response to Willis's 2255 motion as amended. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/18/2019. (kh, )
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255), by Bernetta Lashay Willis. (kh, )
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER entered in 2:06cr71-MHT-SMD, Accordingly, the clerk of court is DIRECTED to: (1) amend the docket entry for doc. no. 373 in this criminal action to describe the document as a motion for reduction of sentence under the First Step Act of 2018, where it will be considered as such; and (2) docket a copy of this same document in civil action no. 2:19cv651-MHT as a motion to amend the motion to vacate, set aside, or correct sentence under 28 U.S.C. 2255 pending in that civil action. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/18/2019.(kh, )
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERED that this #3 motion is DENIED at this time. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/7/2019. (kh, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appointment of Counsel by Bernetta Lashay Willis. (kh, )
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to serve a copy of Willis's 2255 #1 motion upon the U.S Attorney for the Middle District of Alabama; directing the U.S. Attorney to file a response to Willis's 2255 1 motion on or before October 14, 2019, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 9/12/2019. (kh, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Bernetta Lashay Willis. (Attachments: #1 USDC- Middle District of Alabama Criminal Docket Sheet 2:06-cr-071-MEF-CSC-1, #2 USDC- Middle District of Alabama Criminal Judgment 2:06-cr-071-MEF-CSC-1)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willis v. United States of America et al (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernetta Lashay Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?