Zuffa, LLC v. Russell
Plaintiff: Zuffa, LLC
Defendant: George Harvey Russell
Case Number: 2:2019cv00678
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 PRO SE ANSWER to #1 Complaint by George Harvey Russell.(amf, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint signed by Rena Russell for George Harvey Russell, served on 9/21/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (amf, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Correction re #5 Notice, to attach a corrected PDF document to include a "Notice" cover page. (Attachments: #1 Main PDF to Document #5 )(amf, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE (Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright) by Zuffa, LLC (Sinor, Andrew) (Main Document 5 replaced on 9/18/2019 to attach a properly published PDF) (amf, ). Modified on 9/18/2019 (amf, ).. (Main Document 5 replaced on 9/20/2019 to attach a corrected PDF document to include a "Notice" cover page) (amf, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/20/2019: #1 Report on the Filing or Determination of An Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright) (amf, ). Modified on 9/20/2019 (amf, ).
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Zuffa, LLC re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Sinor, Andrew)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Zuffa, LLC; Corporate Disclosures due by 9/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to George Harvey Russell; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (amf, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against George Harvey Russell (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602054936), filed by Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Filing Fee Receipt)(amf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zuffa, LLC v. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Harvey Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zuffa, LLC
Represented By: John Stephen Johnson
Represented By: Andrew Jackson Sinor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?