Bradley v. AutoZone Stores LLC
Plaintiff: Roosevelt Lamar Bradley
Defendant: AutoZone Stores LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00716
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12181Americans
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/11/2019; any party wishing to consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction shall complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 12/11/2019; Do NOT electronically file the consent form nor the reassignment form into the record. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 11/13/2019. (wcl, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by AutoZone Stores LLC.(Greaves, Mac)
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by AutoZone Stores LLC re #8 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Greaves, Mac)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time; Dft may file an answer or responsive pleading on or before 11/12/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 10/18/2019. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to AutoZone Stores LLC; Corporate Disclosures due by 10/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(wcl, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for AutoZone Stores LLC. (wcl, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by AutoZone Stores LLC. (Greaves, Mac)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by Jennifer Lockwood for AutoZone Stores LLC served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (kh, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Roosevelt Lamar Bradley. (wcl, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to AutoZone Stores LLC; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (wcl, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Roosevelt Lamar Bradley. (wcl, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AutoZone Stores LLC (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602055043.), filed by Roosevelt Lamar Bradley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt) (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradley v. AutoZone Stores LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roosevelt Lamar Bradley
Represented By: Lowell Landis Sexton
Represented By: Cassie E. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AutoZone Stores LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?