Town of Rockford, Alabama v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Town of Rockford, Alabama
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD., Allergan PLC, TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Noramco, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals and Mallinckrodt, PLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00725
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Brasher
Referring Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Received email re: case transferred from Alabama Middle has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:19-op-45915, filed 10/24/2019. (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, )
October 18, 2019 Filing 23 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons, corp disclosure, & complaint signed by name illegible for Johnson & Johnson served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. (dmn, )
October 18, 2019 Case transferred to USDC, Northern District of Ohio; Electronically transferred via CM/ECF transfer to Clerk. (NO PDF attached to this entry). (dmn, ) (NO PDF)
October 18, 2019 Filing 22 Received certified copy of Conditional Transfer Order entered on 10/16/2019 by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this action to the USDC for the Northern District of Ohio. (dmn, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 21 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, & #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement signed by Illegible for Actavis, LLC, served on 10/10/2019, answer due 10/31/2019. (amf, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 20 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, & #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement signed by Daniel D. Kelley for Cardinal Health, Inc., served on 10/10/2019, answer due 10/31/2019. (amf, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 19 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, & #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement signed by (No Signature) for Mallinckrodt LLC, served on 10/8/2019, answer due 10/29/2019. (amf, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 18 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, & #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement signed by (No Signature) for Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., served on 10/8/2019, answer due 10/29/2019. (amf, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 17 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, & #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement signed by (No Signature) for Endo Health Solutions, Inc., served on 10/8/2019, answer due 10/29/2019. (amf, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 16 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, & #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement signed by Illegible for Cephalon, Inc., served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (amf, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 15 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons, complaint, and corporate disc statement signed by A Verna for Purdue Pharma, Inc. served on (no date given), answer due 10/30/2019. (djy, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 14 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons, complaint, and corporate disc statement signed by Jennifer Lockwood for Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (djy, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 13 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons, complaint, and corporate disc statement signed by Jennifer Lockwood for Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (djy, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 12 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons, complaint, and corporate disc statement signed by Jennifer Lockwood for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (djy, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 11 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons, complaint, and corporate disc statement signed by Jennifer Lockwood for Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (djy, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons, complaint, and corporate disc statement signed by Jennifer Lockwood for Noramco, Inc. served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (djy, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons, complaint, and corporate disc statement signed by Marilyn for Watson Laboratories, Inc. served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (djy, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons, complaint, and corporate disc statement signed by Julie Buckner for Actavis Pharma, Inc. served on 10/8/2019, answer due 10/29/2019. (djy, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons, complaint, and corporate disc statement signed by Julie Buckner for TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. served on 10/8/2019, answer due 10/29/2019. (djy, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons, complaint, and corporate disc statement signed by Sheila Wilks for The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. served on (no date given), answer due 10/30/2019. (djy, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons, complaint, and corporate disc statement signed by Kelly Webster for Purdue Pharma L.P. served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (djy, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons, corp disclosure, & complaint signed by Kelly Webster for McKesson Corporation served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (djy, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and mailed CMRRR with copy of complaint and corporate disclosure statement to these defendants. (djy, )
September 27, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Town of Rockford, Alabama. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #1 ). (djy, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Town of Rockford, Alabama. (djy, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602055068.), filed by Town of Rockford, Alabama. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet, #2 fee receipt)(djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Town of Rockford, Alabama v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Town of Rockford, Alabama
Represented By: Richard Douglas Stratton
Represented By: Jon Ryan Kral
Represented By: Rhon Eugene Jones
Represented By: William Robert Sutton
Represented By: Jeffrey Donald Price
Represented By: Jere Locke Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?